Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 03:12:34 (UTC).

VELASCO -V- HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 VELASCO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2868

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAN ANTONIO VELASCO

Defendants

DONALD N ROCHE

HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GARY A DORDICK

509 South Beverly Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-4514

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE MUHAR

Pob 51457 3633 E Inland Empire Bl #450

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 2/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 2/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JUAN ANTONIO VELASCO.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JUAN ANTONIO VELASCO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JUAN ANTONIO VELASCO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JUAN ANTONIO VELASCO.

ANSWER FILED BY HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC., DONALD N ROCHE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE MUHAR.

ANSWER FILED BY HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC., DONALD N ROCHE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE MUHAR.; Minutes; Receipt: 160922-0671 $870.00; 160922-0671-CK Reference Number CK 4990

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC. SERVED ON 08/18/16 WITH FEES OF $52.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC. SERVED ON 08/18/16 WITH FEES OF $52.00.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160804-0721 $435.00; 160804-0721-CK Reference Number 2628

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/15/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • FILE ROUTED TO S32 FOR 5/15 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS 4420; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED AND NO APPEARANCES TO STATE CAUSE TO CONTINUE MATTER,; COURT HEREBY DISMISSES ACTION.; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: CASE HAS SETTLED; NO APPEARANCES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • FILE ROUTED TO S32 FOR 3/16 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 2/14/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; DIANA DISKIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JUAN ANTONIO VELASCO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC., DONALD N ROCHE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL STATES THAT THIS CASE HAS SETTLED AND SETTLEMENT TERMS ARE BEING FINALIZED.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SETTLEMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/15/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JUAN ANTONIO VELASCO FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170216-0110 $6.00; 170216-0110-MC Reference Number 03826Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161227-0625 $2.00; 161227-0625-MC Reference Number 026-0002275024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR JUAN ANTONIO VELASCO.; Minutes; Receipt: 161227-0620 $150.00; 161227-0620-MC Reference Number 026-0002275024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC., DONALD N ROCHE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE MUHAR.; Minutes; Receipt: 160922-0671 $870.00; 160922-0671-CK Reference Number CK 4990

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HHS CONSTRUCTION, INC. SERVED ON 08/18/16 WITH FEES OF $52.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160804-0721 $435.00; 160804-0721-CK Reference Number 2628

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HHS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant