This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:59:56 (UTC).

VEGA-V-BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 VEGA-V-BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1640

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA

Defendant

BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: J GREGORY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA PRESENT; BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. REPRESENTED BY DANIEL SERRANO.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:37; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; WITNESS -- RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DANIEL SERRANO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DANIEL SERRANO JR IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENSE.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA PRESENT; BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. REPRESENTED BY DANIEL SERRANO.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:55; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/05/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ***SPECIAL SETTING***; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA PRESENT; BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. REPRESENTED BY DANIEL SERRANO - OWNER.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:45; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR BOTH SIDES. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 12/08/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF RICARDO VEGA ORDERED ENTERED 12/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC.; AND AGAINST RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA; EXHIBITS SHALL BE RETURNED WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: J GREGORY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA PRESENT; BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. REPRESENTED BY DANIEL SERRANO.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:37; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; WITNESS -- RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DANIEL SERRANO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DANIEL SERRANO JR IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENSE.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA PRESENT; BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. REPRESENTED BY DANIEL SERRANO.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:55; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/05/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ***SPECIAL SETTING***; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA PRESENT; BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC. REPRESENTED BY DANIEL SERRANO - OWNER.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:45; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR BOTH SIDES. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO BEST ENGINE AUTO REPAIR INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE/NEW FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RICARDO ARVIZU VEGA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less