This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 01:03:32 (UTC).

VANESSA SOTO -N- MIGUEL A SOTO-JASSO

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 VANESSA SOTO -N- MIGUEL A SOTO-JASSO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0626

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VANESSA SOTO

Respondent

MIGUEL A SOTO-JASSO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; THE JUDGMENT RECEIVED BY THE COURT IS HEREBY RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: IN FORM; FL-180, #4J AND #4K STATES THERE ARE FORMS ATTACHED WHICH ARE NOT. PLEASE CORRECT OR SUBMIT; PROPER FORMS. NO WHITE OUT PLEASE AND INCLUDE A NEW ENVELOPE FOR PETITIONER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MIGUEL A SOTO-JASSO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF VANESSA SOTO AS TO MIGUEL A SOTO-JASSO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VANESSA SOTO FOR PRELIM/WAIVE FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MIGUEL A SOTO-JASSO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/14/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • SEPERATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VANESSA SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0786 $435.00; 161214-0786-DB Reference Number 031-0003513733

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.