This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 14:48:23 (UTC).

VANESSA MARTINDALE -N- BRENT MARTINDALE

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 VANESSA MARTINDALE -N- BRENT MARTINDALE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3128

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VANESSA MARIE MARTINDALE

Respondent

BRENT DWIGHT MARTINDALE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/04/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT VCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF VANESSA MARTINDALE FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF VANESSA MARTINDALE ORDERED ENTERED 12/15/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 11/22/17 BY VANESSA MARIE MARTINDALE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VANESSA MARIE MARTINDALE FOR PRELIM/WVR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRENT DWIGHT MARTINDALE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF VANESSA MARTINDALE AS TO BRENT DWIGHT MARTINDALE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VANESSA MARIE MARTINDALE FOR PRELINMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BRENT DWIGHT MARTINDALE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF VANESSA MARIE MARTINDALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VANESSA MARIE MARTINDALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0194 $435.00; 171004-0194-MC Reference Number 031-0048571746

    Read MoreRead Less