This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:25:09 (UTC).

VAMESSA MEDINA -V- DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 VAMESSA MEDINA -V- DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8777

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANESSA MEDINA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SANTA ANA WATERSHED ASSCOIATION ,

DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE

SANTA ANA WATERSHED ASSOCIATION

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Minor

REYNA MARINA MEDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

RAFII & NAZARIAN LLP

9100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 465E

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

THE SIMON LAW GROUP, LLP

1327 N Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

THE LEE LAW GROUP,PC

17310 Red Hill Ave Ste 350

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/19/18 WITH COSTS OF $150.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/19/18 WITH COSTS OF $150.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2018 OF DUSTIN DRAKE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2018 OF DUSTIN DRAKE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0371 $435.00; 170927-0371-VS Reference Number 142554

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE, SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE, SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF VANESSA MEDINA BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF VANESSA MEDINA BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR REYNA MARINA MEDINA IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS VANESSA MEDINA.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR REYNA MARINA MEDINA IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS VANESSA MEDINA.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE

ANSWER FILED BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE LEE LAW GROUP,PC.

ANSWER FILED BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE LEE LAW GROUP,PC.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF VANESSA MEDINA BY SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF VANESSA MEDINA BY SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2018 OF SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSOCIATION - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2018 OF SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSOCIATION - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

ANSWER FILED BY SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE LEE LAW GROUP,PC.

ANSWER FILED BY SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE LEE LAW GROUP,PC.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF VANESSA MEDINA AS TO VANESSA MEDINA, REYNA MARINA MEDINA ADDING ATTORNEY THE SIMON LAW GROUP, LLP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE, SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,.; Minutes; Receipt: 180409-0226 $150.00; 180409-0226-CK Reference Number 126463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE, SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER TONYA FRYE 12524; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; GREG JACKSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR VANESSA MEDINA.; ATTORNEY JOHNNY DELASHAW APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL DATES ARE SET AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 11/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 7 DAYS.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 7 DAYS; JURY DEMANDED BY BOTH SIDES.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED WITHIN 10 DAYS. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE DEEMED A; WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2018 OF DUSTIN DRAKE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF VANESSA MEDINA BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DEFENDANT DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DUSTIN ROBERT DRAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION, FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 180129-0297 $435.00; 180129-0297-CK Reference Number CK124051

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY SANTA ANA WATERSHEDASSCOIATION,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE LEE LAW GROUP,PC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR REYNA MARINA MEDINA IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS VANESSA MEDINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0371 $435.00; 170927-0371-VS Reference Number 142554

    Read MoreRead Less