This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 06:49:04 (UTC).

VALERIE P MAYBRIER -N- CHRISTOPHER J MAYBRIER

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 VALERIE P MAYBRIER -N- CHRISTOPHER J MAYBRIER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Big Bear District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0028

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Big Bear District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VALERIE P MAYBRIER

Respondent

CHRISTOPHER J MAYBRIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TOKARZ, ARLENE M

17500 Red Hill Ave Ste 230

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2013
  • FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT V10 FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • CASE RECEIVED IN BIG BEAR THIS DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • CHILD SUPPORT CASE REGISTRY FORM RECEIVED FROM VALERIE P MAYBRIER AND SENT TO THE DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES IN SACRAMENTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • CHILD SUPPORT CASE REGISTRY FORM RECEIVED FROM CHRISTOPHER J MAYBRIER AND SENT TO THE DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES IN SACRAMENTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF VALERIE MAYBRIER FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF VALERIE MAYBRIER ORDERED ENTERED 06/26/12; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON CHRISTOPHER J MAYBRIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VALERIE P MAYBRIER FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2011
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VALERIE P MAYBRIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER J MAYBRIER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY VALERIE P MAYBRIER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY VALERIE P MAYBRIER IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON VALERIE P MAYBRIER FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT H1

    Read MoreRead Less