This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:53:45 (UTC).

VACA-V-RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 VACA-V-RODRIGUEZ was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3375

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VINCENTE VACA

ROSA VACA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MARTIN RODRIGUEZ

MARTIN GARCIA

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA TRUCKING

PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS

EASTERN LEASING, INC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA TRUCKING DISTRIBUTION I

PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS, INC.

PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS INC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 -100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON CALCAGNIEROBINSON SHAPIRO DAVIS I

19 Corporate Plaza Dr

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL GRIFFIN LLP

1851 East First Street 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

KINKLE, RODIGER AND SPRIGGS

3333 14Th St

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/04/2019 OF MARTIN GARCIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/04/2019 OF MARTIN GARCIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/05/2018 OF ROSA VACA BY MARTIN RODRIGUEZ, MARTIN GARCIA, PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS, INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/05/2018 OF ROSA VACA BY MARTIN RODRIGUEZ, MARTIN GARCIA, PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS, INC.

DEMURRER FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING; REPRESENTED BY KINKLE, RODIGER ANDSPRIGGS(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING; REPRESENTED BY KINKLE, RODIGER ANDSPRIGGS(IMAGED)

ANSWER FILED BY MARTIN RODRIGUEZ, PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HALL GRIFFIN LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY MARTIN RODRIGUEZ, PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HALL GRIFFIN LLP.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/07/18 WITH COSTS OF $135.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/07/18 WITH COSTS OF $135.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROSA VACA, VINCENTE VACA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROSA VACA, VINCENTE VACA.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/17/18 WITH COSTS OF $135.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/17/18 WITH COSTS OF $135.00 FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY MARTIN GARCIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HALL GRIFFIN LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY MARTIN GARCIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HALL GRIFFIN LLP.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 3 TO BE PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 3 TO BE PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA TRUCKING FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA TRUCKING FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION RE: ROSA VACA AS CO-SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MANUEK VA FILED BY ROSA VACA

DECLARATION RE: ROSA VACA AS CO-SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MANUEK VA FILED BY ROSA VACA

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROSA VACA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; NICHOLAS GEORGE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ROSA VACA, VINCENTE VACA.; SOPHIA DEFRANCIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARTIN RODRIGUEZ, MARTIN GARCIA, PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS, INC..; ATTORNEY JOSH GOLDMAN PRESENT FOR DEFTS, EASTERN LEASING/SOUTHERN CA TRUCKING.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLEADINGS ARE PROPER AND THE ISSUES JOINED.; JURY DEMANDED BY BOTH SIDES.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 7-10 DAY(S).; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 06/04/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/08/20 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S32 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 10 DAYS.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTY GOLDMAN W/ COPY OF DEPT. S32 TRIAL REQUIREMEN.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MARTIN GARCIA, VINCENTE VACA, PREMIER CREEK LOGISTICS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING DISTRIBUTION I.; Minutes; Receipt: 190516-0263 $150.00; 190516-0263-MC Reference Number 06913S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EASTERN LEASING, INC FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 190516-0262 $8.00; 190516-0262-MC Reference Number 06913S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING DISTRIBUTION I; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE, RODIGER ANDSPRIGGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY EASTERN LEASING, INC, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING DISTRIBUTION I.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/05/2018 OF ROSA VACA, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIATRUCKING REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MARTIN GARCIA SERVED ON 09/24/18 WITH FEES OF $22.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: VINCENTE VACA AS CO-SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FILED BY ROSA VACA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ROSA VACA AS CO-SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MANUEK VA FILED BY ROSA VACA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROSA VACA FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 180905-0726 $435.00; 180905-0726-CK Reference Number CK 131669

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.