This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 06:39:43 (UTC).

US BANK VS FARAON

Case Summary

On 02/18/2010 US BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FARAON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0096

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION

Defendant

LORILYN T. FARAON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA & WALLACE,LLP

16520 Bake Pkwy. Suite 280

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( RETUNED TO ATTY IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 100401-0988 $25.00; 100401-0988-CK Reference Number 319590

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/18/2010 OF U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION ORDERED ENTERED 04/01/10; JUDGMENT FOR: U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LORILYN T. FARAON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: LORILYN T. FARAON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LORILYN T. FARAON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/18/2010 OF U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION AS TO LORILYN T. FARAON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LORILYN T. FARAON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/10/10 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON LORILYN T. FARAON; POSTED ON 03/10/10 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/18/2010 OF U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/10 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • ORDER TO POST MAILED TO PLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100308-1769 $20.00; 100308-1769-CK Reference Number 321101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100218-6333 $235.00; 100218-6333-CK Reference Number 312857

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant