This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:56:18 (UTC).

US BANK-V- MARCOS MELCHOR

Case Summary

On 05/06/2016 US BANK-V- MARCOS MELCHOR was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0012

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

MARCOS MELCHOR

Respondents

EDDIE VALENCIA

TERESA MELCHOR

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2301 Dupont Dr Ste 300

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 05/22/17.

REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 05/22/17.

JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED.

APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED.

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED.

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED.

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

LATE LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

LATE LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - AFFIDAVIT RE: CORRECTION TO CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - AFFIDAVIT RE: CORRECTION TO CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - AFFIDAVIT RE: CORRECTION TO CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - AFFIDAVIT RE: CORRECTION TO CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 2 VOL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT/ 1 VOL REPORTERS TRANSCRIP

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 2 VOL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT/ 1 VOL REPORTERS TRANSCRIP

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 05/22/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • APPEAL DISMISSED IN-PART/AFFIRMED IN-PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • HEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A KNISH, JUDGE; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERYL FRANZEN; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: LOZANO; ATTORNEY DAVID M. CHUTE PRESENT FOR RESPONDENT- US BANK.; NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS DISMISSED IN-PART AND AFFIRMED IN-PART.; APPELLANT MARCOS MELCHOR PRESENT AFTER CASE CALLED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • CASE PREPARED FOR MAY CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - AFFIDAVIT RE: CORRECTION TO CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR MARCOS MELCHOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - AFFIDAVIT RE: CORRECTION TO CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 2 VOL CLERKS TRANSCRIPT/ 1 VOL REPORTERS TRANSCRIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARCOS MELCHOR FOR CLERKS AND REPORTERS TRANSCRIPTS; Minutes; Receipt: 160825-0739 $55.10; 160825-0739-CK Reference Number 108180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARCOS MELCHOR FOR RESPONDENTS CLERKS AND REPORTERS TRANSCRIPTS; Minutes; Receipt: 160825-0737 $205.50; 160825-0737-CK Reference Number 108180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #UDFS1401624- SBJC

    Read MoreRead Less