This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:05:01 (UTC).

US BANK -V- LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 US BANK -V- LAWRENCE was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4685

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9

Defendants

WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR

ELIZABETH LAWRENCE

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAIMAN LAW GROUP, PC

4660 La Jolla Village Drive Suite 850

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9.

ANSWER FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9.

ANSWER FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ELIZABETH LAWRENCE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ELIZABETH LAWRENCE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PURSUANT TO RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 8/28/17 HAS BEEN CHANGED.; THE HEARING IS RESET FOR 8/08/17 AT 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ALL PARTIES ARE NOTIFIED TO APPEAR.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0044 $255.00

DEMURRER FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9.; Minutes; Receipt: 170822-0503 $500.00; 170822-0503-CK Reference Number 12722

DECLARATION OF MIKE NOVAK-SMITH FILED

DECLARATION OF MIKE NOVAK-SMITH FILED

DECLARATION OF SHERI GONZALEZ FILED

DECLARATION OF SHERI GONZALEZ FILED

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9; Disposition: GRANTED

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY BARRY OCONNOR FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9'S MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9'S MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 ORDERED ENTERED 08/29/17; JUDGMENT FOR: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR, ELIZABETH LAWRENCE; NO MONEY JUDGMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR, ELIZABETH LAWRENCE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:54; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT, POINTS & AUTHORITIES, ETC. BY FEDEX OVERNIGHT DELIVERY ON 08/21/17 AS TO WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT, POINTS & AUTHORITIES, ETC. BY FEDEX OVERNIGHT DELIVERY ON 08/21/17 AS TO WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR, FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY BARRY OCONNOR FOR NAIMAN LAW GROUP (FOR PLAINTIFF).; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR, ELIZABETH LAWRENCE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:40; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL .; COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED DEFENDANTS DEMURRER.; COURT FINDS:; COURT FINDS THAT THERES NO BASIS FOR THE DEMURRER.; DEMURRER IS OVERRULED AS TO WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; DEFENDANT HAS 5 DAYS TO FILE AN ANSWER.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; 08:43; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER FILED BY U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER FILED BY U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/17 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 170901-0525 $25.00; 170901-0525-CK Reference Number CK 12745

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY BARRY OCONNOR FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9'S MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9'S MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 ORDERED ENTERED 08/29/17; JUDGMENT FOR: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR, ELIZABETH LAWRENCE; NO MONEY JUDGMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR, ELIZABETH LAWRENCE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:54; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT, POINTS & AUTHORITIES, ETC. BY FEDEX OVERNIGHT DELIVERY ON 08/21/17 AS TO WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER FILED BY WILLIAM LAWRENCE JR; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $50.00.--BEGINNING ON 07/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0044 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less