This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 08:29:46 (UTC).

US BANK -V- FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 08/28/2012 US BANK filed an Other lawsuit against FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0071

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

DEBORAH F FERNANDEZ

Respondent

US BANK NATINAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BRYAN CAVE

3161 Michelson Drive Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2013
  • APPEAL COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • APPEAL FILED 08/28/2012 OF DEBORAH FERNANDEZ COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 01/25/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL RECEIVED BACK FROM APPELLANT FERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • APPEAL DISMISSED -- BEFORE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • ORDER DIMISSING APPEAL S FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • NO OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • LATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 01/02/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 11/22/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • LETTER SENT TO APPELLANT RE: AMENDING DESIGNATION AS TO RECORD OF ORAL PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • NAIMAN LAW GROUP, PC IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR US BANK NATINAL, AND BRYAN CAVE IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #UDCS1200226 - CHINO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S BANK NATIONAL is a litigant