This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/05/2021 at 11:29:31 (UTC).

URIBE-V-CULICHI TOWN

Case Summary

On 01/17/2014 URIBE-V-CULICHI TOWN was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ochoa, Gilbert, McCarville, Brian S and Plotkin, Barry L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0577

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ochoa, Gilbert

McCarville, Brian S

Plotkin, Barry L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

URIBE, GABRIEL

Defendant

CALIFORNIA FORCE PATROL INC

Not Yet Classified

CULICHI TOWN, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAWYERS GROUP INC

Attorney at The Lawyers Group Inc

265 S Randolph Ave Suite 230

Brea, CA 92821

Not Yet Classified Attorney

WELLMAN & WARREN

Attorney at Wellman & Warren

24411 Ridge Route Drive Suite 200

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

07/18/2017: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

07/15/2016: SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT. PLEASE BE ADVISED A DEFAUL

05/17/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING SENT. PLEASE BE ADVISED A DEFAUL

REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE- DEFAULT PROV

05/17/2016: REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE- DEFAULT PROV

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST

05/11/2016: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST

DECLARATION OF TYLER C. TOOMEY IN SUPP OF DFLT JDG

05/11/2016: DECLARATION OF TYLER C. TOOMEY IN SUPP OF DFLT JDG

DECLARATION OF GABRIEL URIBE IN SUPP OF DFLT JDGMN

05/11/2016: DECLARATION OF GABRIEL URIBE IN SUPP OF DFLT JDGMN

BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE FILED.

05/11/2016: BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

04/19/2016: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION OF GABRIEL URIBE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT

03/29/2016: DECLARATION OF GABRIEL URIBE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF TYLER C TOOMEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAUL

03/29/2016: DECLARATION OF TYLER C TOOMEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAUL

BRIEF SUMMARY OF CASE PER CRC 3.1800(A)(1),(6) FIL

03/29/2016: BRIEF SUMMARY OF CASE PER CRC 3.1800(A)(1),(6) FIL

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF GABRIE

03/29/2016: DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF GABRIE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CALIFORNIA FORCE

03/29/2016: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CALIFORNIA FORCE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

02/09/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

02/09/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CULICHI T

02/08/2016: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CULICHI T

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CULICHI T

02/08/2016: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CULICHI T

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Comment: ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER CARRIE LANE;8882 COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD ACTION CAME ON FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/NO PROOF OF SERVICE ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketORAP -- Examination of Judgment Debtor; Original Type: ORAP -- Examination of Judgment Debtor; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20170718-0044; ConversionPayment; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY GABRIEL URIBE FOR ORAP 170718-0044-CK MMF/ 60.00 PAYMT 170718-0044-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3557732

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order for Examination Filed; Comment: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Judgment Type: Judgment; Comment; Comment: (1/17/2014 - 0001 - CMPCOMPLAINT (UNLIMITED)); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: URIBE, GABRIEL; Awarded Against: CALIFORNIA FORCE PATROL INC; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $1,374.47; Other: $65,000.00; Other Comment: Principle; Total: $66374.47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSigned Judgment Filed With Court; Comment: SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,100.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketPrayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of; Comment: PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0. PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 01/17/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketPrayed for Amount and/or Damages in the Amount of; Comment: PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 140117-2065-CK CVR/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less