This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:30:53 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL SELF STORAGE UPLAND -V- RUTLEDGE

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 UNIVERSAL SELF STORAGE UPLAND filed an Other lawsuit against RUTLEDGE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2134

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL SELF STORAGE UPLAND

Defendant

SHAWNA E RUTLEDGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDER & MELLO

4676 Lakeview Ave Suite 201

Yorba Linda, CA 92886

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0848 $240.00; 170206-0848-CK Reference Number 87933

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0848 $240.00; 170206-0848-CK Reference Number 87933

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:20; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO $50.00 FOR FAILING TO; COMPLY WITH CRC 3.470(E). TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS THAT MAY BE IMPOSED: $125.00.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 08/07/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:21; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0848 $240.00; 170206-0848-CK Reference Number 87933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.