This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 12:43:34 (UTC).

UNIGARD INDEMNITY CO-V-VIKKI SHORE, ETAL

Case Summary

On 03/04/2011 UNIGARD INDEMNITY CO-V-VIKKI SHORE, ETAL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2351

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

UNIGARD INDEMNITY COMPANY

RAE SEGERSTROM

THEODORE SEGERSTROM

Defendants and Appellants

12180 STRATFORD TRUST

VIKKI SHORE

LINDSEY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

RAE SEGERSTROM

THEODORE SEGERSTROM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

HOPPE LAW GROUP

680 W. Shaw Avenue Suite 207

Fresno, CA 93704

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

JEFFREY A COHEN

625 Fair Oaks Suite 255

South Pasadena, CA 91030

KEVIN M TRIPI

2030 Main Street, Ste 1040

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KEVIN M TRIPI

2030 Main Street, Ste 1040

Irvine, CA 92614

HOPPE LAW GROUP

680 W. Shaw Avenue Suite 207

Fresno, CA 93704

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2013
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 08985C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VIKKI SHORE FOR FAX FILING FEE 5PGS; Minutes; Receipt: 130410-3285 $5.00; 130410-3285-VS Reference Number 08985C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN AMOUNT OF $1,615.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS - FILED.; Minutes; SEE JUDGMENT FOR TERMS AND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY VIKKI SHORE, 12180 STRATFORD TRUST, FOR 1615.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL RESP TO FORM ROGS/SANC-SHORE/LINDSEY LTD; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL FORM ROGS/SANC-12180 STRATFORD&SHORE Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL RESP SPECIAL ROGS/SANC FROM VIKKI SHORE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
214 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AS TO VIKKI SHORE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LINDSEY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP SERVED ON 06/06/11 WITH FEES OF $51.28.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO 12180 STRATFORD TRUST SERVED ON 06/06/11 WITH FEES OF $51.28.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT R UNGER; APPEARANCES:; DAVID DEFRANK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR UNIGARD INDEMNITY COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REPORTS THAT THEY ARE RUNNING A SKIP TRACE ON THE DEFENDANT VIKKI SHORE, THE OTHER; DEFENDANTS HAVE BEEN SERVED VIA NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT TO THEIR ATTORNEY.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/29/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110314-0918 $4.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110308-1526 $395.00; 110308-1526-CK Reference Number 3505

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.