This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 10:57:43 (UTC).

UNIFUND -V- PACHECO

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 UNIFUND filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PACHECO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0462

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Defendant

THOMAS D PACHECO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RESURGENCE LEGAL GROUP PC

10805 Holder Street Suite 205

Cypress, CA 90630

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/16/2017 OF UNIFUND CCR, LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/16/2017 OF UNIFUND CCR, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/16/2017 OF UNIFUND CCR, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: UNIFUND CCR, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THOMAS D PACHECO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,707.13 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $253.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,960.13; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

PLTFS SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

PLTFS SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY UNIFUND CCR, LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY UNIFUND CCR, LLC

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/16/2017 OF UNIFUND CCR, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/16/2017 OF UNIFUND CCR, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST THOMAS D PACHECO FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST THOMAS D PACHECO FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THOMAS D PACHECO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THOMAS D PACHECO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180607-0510 $25.00; 180607-0510-CK Reference Number 186746

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( $4,825.07 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $839.94)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/16/2017 OF UNIFUND CCR, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/16/2017 OF UNIFUND CCR, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: UNIFUND CCR, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THOMAS D PACHECO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,707.13 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $253.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,960.13; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLTFS SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THOMAS D PACHECO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,707.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY UNIFUND CCR, LLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171020-0118 $240.00; 171020-0118-CK Reference Number 051319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less