This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 07:43:08 (UTC).

TYBO VS MEJIA

Case Summary

On 04/30/2010 TYBO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MEJIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0229

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYBO LLC INCLUDINGANY ASSIGNEES AND/OR

Defendants

ROSA MEJIA

JUSUS MEJIA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E BOUZANE

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/30/2010 OF TYBO LLC INCLUDINGANY ASSIGNEES AND/OR GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: TYBO LLC INCLUDINGANY ASSIGNEES AND/OR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROSA MEJIA, JUSUS MEJIA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $505.00 AND DAMAGES $2,550.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,055.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON DOES/DOES ALREADY DISMISSED ON THIS CASE PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 100518-3829 $25.00; 100518-3829-CK Reference Number 150298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROSA MEJIA, JUSUS MEJIA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/30/2010 OF TYBO LLC INCLUDINGANY ASSIGNEES AND/OR AS TO ROSA MEJIA, JUSUS MEJIA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 04/30/2010 OF TYBO LLC INCLUDINGANY ASSIGNEES AND/OR ORDERED ENTERED 05/18/10; JUDGMENT FOR: TYBO LLC INCLUDINGANY ASSIGNEES AND/OR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROSA MEJIA, JUSUS MEJIA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ROSA MEJIA, JUSUS MEJIA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/02/10 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROSA MEJIA SERVED ON 05/02/10 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JUSUS MEJIA SERVED ON 05/02/10 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/30/2010 OF TYBO LLC INCLUDINGANY ASSIGNEES AND/OR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100430-4187 $235.00; 100430-4187-CK Reference Number 149037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUZANE JOHN E. ESQ.