This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:09:19 (UTC).

TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK -V- SANTOS G PEREZ

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK -V- SANTOS G PEREZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1396

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK

Defendant

SANTOS G PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREWER & BREWER

4533 Mac Arthur Blvd Suite 707

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0159 $240.00; 171030-0159-CK Reference Number 0097499

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 7894.93 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180730-0094 $25.00; 180730-0094-CK Reference Number 0098676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $135.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $42.15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180730-0919 $25.00; 180730-0919-CK Reference Number CK#0098678

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/USE OF COPIES/1033/1717 FILED BY TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 06/20/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SANTOS G PEREZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,701.61 INTEREST $899.15 ATTORNEY FEES $720.16 COSTS $371.86 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,692.78; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON SANTOS G PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0072067798

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FOR STIP & ORDER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180403-0032 $20.00; 180403-0032-CK Reference Number 0098134

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FOR SANTOS G PEREZ, ADD SANTOS GUILLERMO PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0159 $240.00; 171030-0159-CK Reference Number 0097499

    Read MoreRead Less