This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:12:12 (UTC).

TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK -V- LUIS ROJAS

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUIS ROJAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1404

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK

Defendants

LUID JAVIER ROJAS

LUIS JAVIER ROJAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREWER & BREWER

4533 Mac Arthur Blvd Suite 707

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 02/13/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LUIS JAVIER ROJAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,720.82 INTEREST $392.01 ATTORNEY FEES $722.08 COSTS $306.86 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,141.77; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

DECLARATION RE: USE OF COPIES; 1033; 1717; REQUEST FOR INTEREST AND FEES FILED BY TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK.

DECLARATION RE: USE OF COPIES; 1033; 1717; REQUEST FOR INTEREST AND FEES FILED BY TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LUIS JAVIER ROJAS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LUIS JAVIER ROJAS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LUIS JAVIER ROJAS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LUIS JAVIER ROJAS FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LUIS JAVIER ROJAS SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH FEES OF $66.86.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LUIS JAVIER ROJAS SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH FEES OF $66.86.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0346 $240.00; 171030-0346-CK Reference Number 97500

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( 7358.47 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180328-0716 $25.00; 180328-0716-CK Reference Number CK-0098004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $133.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $58.70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180309-0117 $25.00; 180309-0117-CK Reference Number 0097940

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 02/13/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LUIS JAVIER ROJAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,720.82 INTEREST $392.01 ATTORNEY FEES $722.08 COSTS $306.86 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,141.77; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: USE OF COPIES; 1033; 1717; REQUEST FOR INTEREST AND FEES FILED BY TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK AS TO LUIS JAVIER ROJAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LUIS JAVIER ROJAS SERVED ON 11/10/17 WITH FEES OF $66.86.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0346 $240.00; 171030-0346-CK Reference Number 97500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PARTY LUIS JAVIER ROJAS UPDATED: SPELLING OF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less