Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 08:41:52 (UTC).

TUSCANY VS MYERS

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 TUSCANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MYERS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5291

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUSCANY APARTMENTS

Defendant

WILLIAM MYERS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSC.

3691 Adams St

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/27/2017 OF TUSCANY APARTMENTS ORDERED ENTERED 08/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: TUSCANY APARTMENTS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM MYERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: WILLIAM MYERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WILLIAM MYERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WILLIAM MYERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON WILLIAM MYERS; POSTED ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON WILLIAM MYERS; POSTED ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0402 $255.00; 170801-0402-CK Reference Number 67594

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TUSCANY APARTMENTS FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170829-0626 $25.00; 170829-0626-CK Reference Number 68548

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/27/2017 OF TUSCANY APARTMENTS ORDERED ENTERED 08/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: TUSCANY APARTMENTS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM MYERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: WILLIAM MYERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WILLIAM MYERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/27/2017 OF TUSCANY APARTMENTS AS TO WILLIAM MYERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON WILLIAM MYERS; POSTED ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/27/2017 OF TUSCANY APARTMENTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170803-0259 $20.00; 170803-0259-CK Reference Number 8389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,005.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.04.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0402 $255.00; 170801-0402-CK Reference Number 67594

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUSCANY APARTMENTS is a litigant