This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 03:13:17 (UTC).

TRINITY -v- MORALES et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 TRINITY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MORALES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3957

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRINITY CAPITAL LLC,

Defendants

SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA

JOANNA JASMIN MORALES

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWRENCE F SCHOELCH

P.O. Box 413

San Bernardino, CA 92402

 

Court Documents

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/13/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/13/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LAWRENCE SCHOELCH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT JOANNA JASMIN MORALES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; CATHY LU IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; MOTION TO BAR DEFENDANTS TESTIMONY IS DENIED; WITNESS -- JOANNA MORALES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/12/2017 OF TRINITY CAPITAL LLC, ORDERED ENTERED 07/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: TRINITY CAPITAL LLC,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOANNA JASMIN MORALES, SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,050.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $200.00 COSTS $405.00 AND DAMAGES $175.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,830.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOANNA JASMIN MORALES, SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 07/22/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; 09:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED AT THE COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED AT THE COUNTER)

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JOANNA JASMIN MORALES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JOANNA JASMIN MORALES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOANNA JASMIN MORALES; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/13/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOANNA JASMIN MORALES; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/13/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/13/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/13/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170612-0685 $255.00; 170612-0685-CK Reference Number 429

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170707-0865 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/12/2017 OF TRINITY CAPITAL LLC,, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/13/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LAWRENCE SCHOELCH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT JOANNA JASMIN MORALES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; CATHY LU IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; MOTION TO BAR DEFENDANTS TESTIMONY IS DENIED; WITNESS -- JOANNA MORALES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/12/2017 OF TRINITY CAPITAL LLC, ORDERED ENTERED 07/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: TRINITY CAPITAL LLC,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOANNA JASMIN MORALES, SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,050.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $200.00 COSTS $405.00 AND DAMAGES $175.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,830.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOANNA JASMIN MORALES, SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 07/22/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; 09:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED AT THE COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JOANNA JASMIN MORALES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOANNA JASMIN MORALES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DEFAULT/712/JUD/WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOANNA JASMIN MORALES; PARTY SERVED ON 06/13/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SERGIO NAVARRO-HERRERA; PARTY SERVED ON 06/13/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $35.00.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,050.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170612-0685 $255.00; 170612-0685-CK Reference Number 429

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.