This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:06:01 (UTC).

TRI COUNTY DENTAL -V- BRENDA MILLER D.D.S.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 TRI COUNTY DENTAL -V- BRENDA MILLER D D S was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9032

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC.

Defendant

BRENDA MILLER D.D.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDSMAN, PHILIP

5776 Lindero Canyon Road Suite D-666

Westlake Village, CA 91362

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF LUISE LOPEZ

4075 Eleventh Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON BRENDA MILLER D.D.S..

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON BRENDA MILLER D.D.S..

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC. ORDERED ENTERED 01/22/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRENDA MILLER D.D.S.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,366.97 INTEREST $2,887.08 ATTORNEY FEES $1,200.00 COSTS $321.95 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $13,776.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH FEES OF $81.95.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH FEES OF $81.95.

DECLARATION OF PLAS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT J FILED

DECLARATION OF PLAS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT J FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION OF PLAS COUNSEL RE: ATTY FEES ON ACCOUNT STATED FILED

DECLARATION OF PLAS COUNSEL RE: ATTY FEES ON ACCOUNT STATED FILED

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033(B)(2) FILED BY TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033(B)(2) FILED BY TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. FILED.

PLAS EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

PLAS EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION OF PLAS COUNSEL OF AUTHENTICITY OF DIGITAL SIGNATURE FILED

DECLARATION OF PLAS COUNSEL OF AUTHENTICITY OF DIGITAL SIGNATURE FILED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY BRENDA MILLER D.D.S.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF LUISE LOPEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC..; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC. ORDERED SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BRENDA MILLER D.D.S..; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO BRENDA MILLER D.D.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. FOR STIP AND ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180828-0790 $20.00; 180828-0790-CK Reference Number 3604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM DEFAULT JUDGMENT (05.29.18) FILED BY DEFENDANT BRENDA MILLER D.D.S.; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:46; COURT NOTES DEFENDANT COUNSEL/MOVING PARTY CALLED IN VIA TELECOMM THIS MORNING TO REQUEST TO TAKE; MATTER OFF CALENDAR AS PARTIES HAVE STIPULATED TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; 09:48; COURT IN RECESS.; 10:16; COURT RECONVENES AS FOLLOWS; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PARTIES STIPULATE TO SET ASIDE DEAFULT JUDGMENT.; DEFENDANT COUNSEL TO SUBMIT ANSWER/RESPONSIVE PLEADING BY NO LATER THAN 09/14/18.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/16/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S17; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 10:16; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM DEFAULT JUDGMENT (05.29.18) FILED BY DEFENDANT BRENDA MILLER D.D.S.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LUIS E. LOPEZ, ESQ PRESENT FOR BRENDA MILLER, DDS.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY LUIS E. LOPES, ESQ FOR PHILIP LANDSMAN FOR TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:40; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: PARTIES ARE ATTEMPTING TO RESOLVE MATTER.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:41; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. FOR MOTION; Minutes; Receipt: 180529-0759 $60.00; 180529-0759-CK Reference Number 3525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DEFENDANT BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 180529-0758 $240.00; 180529-0758-CK Reference Number 3525

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BRENDA MILLER D.D.S. SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH FEES OF $81.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TRI COUNTY DENTAL SUPPLY INC. FOR FIRST PAPOER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0741 $240.00; 170927-0741-CK Reference Number #007049/240578

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less