This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 14:57:07 (UTC).

TREVOR D. WILLIAMS -N- JESSICA I. WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 TREVOR D WILLIAMS -N- JESSICA I WILLIAMS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0813

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TREVOR D WILLIAMS

Respondent

JESSICA I WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHEN, TINA M

3200 Guasti Road Ste 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Respondent Attorney

, CHUNG & IGNA CIO

8577 Haven Ave Suite 306

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY TREVOR D WILLIAMS RE: MOD CC/CV/OTHER (032718)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF TREVOR WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPT 06/20/18 @ 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • REFERRAL TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY TREVOR D WILLIAMS RE: MOD CC/CV/OTHER (032718); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHERYL C KERSEY, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE KAZALUNAS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: J VILLESCAS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ANH ZAPIEN MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; FOR ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION.; REFERRED; REFERRED TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES.; FOR NEXT AVAILABLE INTAKE APPOINTMENT.; THE PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO REPORT FORTHWITH TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES AND TO COOPERATE FULLY WITH THE CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR DURING ALL STAGES OF THE MEDIATION/EVALUATION.; PROCESS. CUSTODIAL PARENT(S) SHALL MAKE CHILDREN AVAILABLE AT ALL TIMES REQUESTED BY COUNSELOR.; REFERRAL TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FILED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S53.; COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION FILED BY JESSICA I WILLIAMS RE:RFO FILED BY TREVOR D WILLIAMS ON 03/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT JESSICA WILLIAMS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH CHUNG & IGNA CIO AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JESSICA I WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TREVOR D WILLIAMS FOR STIP/ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 170519-0591 $20.00; 170519-0591-CK Reference Number 2262

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JESSICA I WILLIAMS FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JESSICA I WILLIAMS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF TREVOR WILLIAMS BY JESSICA I WILLIAMS FILED. REPRESENTED BY CHUNG & IGNA CIO.; Minutes; Receipt: 170214-0866 $435.00; 170214-0866-CK Reference Number 2086

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0200 $435.00; 170131-0200-CK Reference Number 2837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S53

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.