This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:32:56 (UTC).

TRELAN-V-RYAN

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 TRELAN-V-RYAN was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9504

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATHAN R TRELAN

Defendants

LARRY GENE GOODRICH

ESTATE OF DANIEL JOHN RYAN

ESTATE OF LARRY GENE GOODRICH

DANIEL JOHN RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVITT, LEICHENGER& ABERLE

8383 Wilshire Blvd Ste 970

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorney

THE SAFARIAN FIRM APC

3150 Montrose Ave

Glendale, CA 91214

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES FILED BY ESTATE OF LARRY GENE GOODRICH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0077053071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR ESTATE OF LARRY GENE GOODRICH.; Minutes; Receipt: 180716-0529 $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ESTATE OF LARRY GENE GOODRICH FOR FAX/POST/ENVLP/COPY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180716-0530 $4.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR NO POS/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DANIEL SPITZER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NATHAN R TRELAN.; ATTORNEY PIERRO BABIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ESTATE OF LARRY GENE GOODRICH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 7 DAYS; PRIVATE MEDIATION IS TO BE COMPLETED 30 DAYS PRIOR TO THE TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE OF; 5/23/19.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED WITHIN 30 DAYS. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE DEEMED A; WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 05/23/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/28/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 7 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NATHAN R TRELAN FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180622-0721 $3.00; 180622-0721-MC Reference Number 02295G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY NATHAN R TRELAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BY MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ON 04/06/18 AS TO ESTATE OF LARRY GOODRICH, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NATHAN R TRELAN FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0430 $435.00; 171005-0430-CK Reference Number CK 5827

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEES OF $435.00 DUE TO THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 10/11/17. IF A HEARING HAS BEEN SET, YOU MUST SUBMIT THE FEES ONE DAY PRIOR TO THE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less