This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:52:45 (UTC).

TREE STAR VS THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 TREE STAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMPSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0993

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THREE STAR AUTO SALE

Defendant

CATONA THOMPSON

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:18; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; THREE STAR AUTO SALE REPRESENTED BY MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CATONA THOMPSON; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; CATONA THOMPSON HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; MIGUEL HERNANDEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 10:22; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CATONA THOMPSON. PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CATONA THOMPSON. PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF THREE STAR AUTO SALE FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF THREE STAR AUTO SALE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CATONA THOMPSON. PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CATONA THOMPSON. PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; RULING NOT RECORDED; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST CATONA THOMPSON.; JUDGMENT FOR: THREE STAR AUTO SALE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CATONA THOMPSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,802.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $115.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,917.00; JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF FOR $8,802.00, WITH MONEY JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF WAIVES LIEN IN LIEU.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF THREE STAR AUTO SALE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:18; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; THREE STAR AUTO SALE REPRESENTED BY MIGUEL HERNANDEZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CATONA THOMPSON; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; CATONA THOMPSON HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; MIGUEL HERNANDEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 10:22; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CATONA THOMPSON. PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-2569 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less