This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:23:26 (UTC).

TOY LOCKER V CHATMAN

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 TOY LOCKER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHATMAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1017

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOY LOCKER INC

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 03/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 03/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF TOY LOCKER INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF TOY LOCKER INC FILED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:19; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; TOY LOCKER INC REPRESENTED BY CHAD FIGUEROA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; CHAD FIGUEROA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN.; JUDGMENT FOR: TOY LOCKER INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $175.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,175.00; PLAINTIFF MAY PROCEED WITH THE LIEN SALE ON THIS DEBT; 10:22; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0727 $50.00; 161214-0727-VS Reference Number 014821

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF TOY LOCKER INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:19; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; TOY LOCKER INC REPRESENTED BY CHAD FIGUEROA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; CHAD FIGUEROA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN.; JUDGMENT FOR: TOY LOCKER INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $175.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,175.00; PLAINTIFF MAY PROCEED WITH THE LIEN SALE ON THIS DEBT; 10:22; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO CHRISTOPHER CHATMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 03/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TOY LOCKER INC FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0733 $2.50; 161214-0733-VS Reference Number 014821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0727 $50.00; 161214-0727-VS Reference Number 014821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.