Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/29/2018 at 00:28:11 (UTC).

TOWNS, ETAL -v- RITE AID CORPORATION, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2010 TOWNS, ETAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RITE AID CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0513

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GERALDINE TOWNS

JUSTIN LEWIS TOWNS

EDWARD LEWIS TOWNS

Defendants

THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC

RITE AID CORPORATION

DOE ASSISTANT MANAGER

DOE ASISTANT MANAGER AAR ON

THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.

AARON BERNREUTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS P WILSON

3322 W Victory Blvd

Burbank, CA 91505

Defendant Attorney

DUNBAR & ASSOCIATES

608 Silver Spur Rd, Ste 245

Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN COURTROOM 9/19/11 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: EDWARD LEWIS TOWNS, THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC., AARON BERNREUTER; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO APPEARANCE.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • FILE SENT TO S34 (VOL.2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/11 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY EDWARD LEWIS TOWNS, GERALDINE TOWNS, JUSTIN LEWIS TOWNS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • STAY OF EXECUTION GRANTED ON CASE. REASON: CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2010
  • FILE TO S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • CASE TRACKED TO LEGAL RESEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • CASE TRACKED TO MOTION WALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2010 OF EDWARD TOWNS, RITE AID CORPORATION REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • DEMURRER FILED BY THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC; REPRESENTED BY DUNBAR & ASSOCIATES; Minutes; Receipt: 100223-5716 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2010 OF EDWARD TOWNS, THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • MOTION RE: STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC; Minutes; Receipt: 100223-5727 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100119-3089 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2010 OF EDWARD TOWNS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RITE AID CORP. is a litigant