This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 21:06:11 (UTC).

TOWN SQUARE -V- SUPERIOR AUTO

Case Summary

On 05/10/2018 TOWN SQUARE filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SUPERIOR AUTO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2708

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants

WAHIB MUSHARBASH

SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT

MOSES MUSHARBASH

WAHIB "BILL" MUSHARBASH

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REID & HELLYER

3880 Lemon Street Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92502

Defendant Attorney

SEARS, ANTHONY A

2350 N. San Gabriel Canyon Roa

Azusa, CA 91702-1401

 

Court Documents

DEMURRER FILED BY SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY A SEARS(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY A SEARS(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY A SEARS(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY A SEARS(IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SET FOR HEARING ON 06/15/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SET FOR HEARING ON 06/15/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180605-0004 $60.00

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SET FOR HEARING ON 06/15/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SET FOR HEARING ON 06/15/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180605-0004 $60.00

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAY H ROBINSON, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; COURT ATTENDANT M EVANS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SCOTT TALKOV PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ANTHONY SEARS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:35; MOTION; SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT'S MOTION DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS HEARD.; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS DENIED; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; DEMURRER SUSTAINED AS TO MOSES, WAHID AND SUPERIOR AUTO ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 OF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC, WITH 5 DAYS TO AMEND.; AMEND NO LATER THAN 7/9/18; THE COURT NOTES THAT THIS IS THE 2ND TIME HERE ON IDENTICAL FACTS.; 08:58; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT/AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/02/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT/AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/02/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. DEFAULT AS TO SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER IS/ARE HEREBY VACATED. NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES.

CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. DEFAULT AS TO SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER IS/ARE HEREBY VACATED. NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; Disposition: DENIED

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:51; JAY H ROBINSON, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; COURT ATTENDANT M EVANS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SCOTT TALKOV PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ANTHONY SEARS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT'S MOTION QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF .; REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IS GRANTED; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT .; AFTER ARGUMENT,; SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE IS DENIED.; DEFENDANT HAS 5 DAYS FROM RECEIPT OF THE NOTICE OF; RULING TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; 08:59; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: MOTION TO QUASH SET FOR HEARING ON 06/15/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: MOTION TO QUASH SET FOR HEARING ON 06/15/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 06/01/18 AS TO ALL UNKNOWNS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 06/01/18 AS TO ALL UNKNOWNS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/31/18 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/31/18 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY OVERNIGHT DELIVERY ON 06/05/18 AS TO ANTHONY SEARS-ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY OVERNIGHT DELIVERY ON 06/05/18 AS TO ANTHONY SEARS-ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT, FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ALL PARTIES OVERNIGHT MAIL 07/09/18 FILED. (IMAGED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • ON THE 2ND AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC, MOSES MUSHARBASH IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • ON THE 2ND AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC, WAHIB MUSHARBASH IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): AMENDED SUMMONS NOT INCLUDED WITH SECOND AMENDED C OMPLAINT..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAY H ROBINSON, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; COURT ATTENDANT M EVANS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SCOTT TALKOV PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ANTHONY SEARS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:35; MOTION; SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT'S MOTION DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS HEARD.; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS DENIED; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; DEMURRER SUSTAINED AS TO MOSES, WAHID AND SUPERIOR AUTO ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 OF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC, WITH 5 DAYS TO AMEND.; AMEND NO LATER THAN 7/9/18; THE COURT NOTES THAT THIS IS THE 2ND TIME HERE ON IDENTICAL FACTS.; 08:58; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT/AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/02/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC (IMAGED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON WAHIB "BILL" MUSHARBASH; PARTY SERVED ON 05/15/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT; PARTY SERVED ON 05/15/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER FILED BY SUPERIOR AUTO CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT, WAHIB "BILL" MUSHARBASH, MOSES MUSHARBASH; REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY A SEARS(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180521-0965 $720.00; 180521-0965-CK Reference Number 5419

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $0.00.--BEGINNING ON 05/10/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180510-0711 $255.00; 180510-0711-CK Reference Number 127592

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less