This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/05/2018 at 21:08:16 (UTC).

TORRES -V- SILVA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 TORRES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SILVA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1050

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERESA TORRES

Defendant

RAQUEL SILVA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2011
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 06/30/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; DONALD DENCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF TERESA TORRES PRESENT; DEFENDANT RAQUEL SILVA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; 03:15; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- TERESA TORRES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- RAQUEL LILVA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; JUDGE GOES OUTSIDE TO VIEW THE VEHICLE; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF TERESA TORRES AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT TERESA TORRES HAVE &; RECOVER FROM RAQUEL SILVA:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,145.58 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $50.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,195.58; COURT FINDS THAT THIS ACCIDENT DID NOT HAPPEN ON A CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY; IT WAS ON PRIVATE PROPERTY; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RAQUEL SILVA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/09/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY TERESA TORRES. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY TERESA TORRES IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON TERESA TORRES FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less