This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:47:40 (UTC).

TORRES -V- COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 TORRES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2206

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUZ TORRES

Defendant

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SITZER, ANDREW D

930 E. Santa Ana Blvd

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Defendant Attorney

MCCUNE & HARBER LLP

515 S. Figueroa Street Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LUZ TORRES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE / FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171107-0369 $441.00; 171107-0369-MC Reference Number 033-0040515921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LUZ TORRES FOR FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171107-0361 $4.00; 171107-0361-MC Reference Number 033-0040514845

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • NOTICE TO COURT OF IMPROVED FINANCIAL SITUATION OR SETTLEMENT FILED BY LUZ TORRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.; Minutes; Receipt: 170808-1008 $150.00; 170808-1008-CK Reference Number CK 155152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ANDREW SITZER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR LUZ TORRES.; ATTORNEY BABAK SHIRDEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY DEMANDED BY DEFENDANT.; NO JURY FEES HAVE BEEN POSTED. THE COURT ORDERS JURY FEES TO BE POSTED WITHIN 30 DAYS OF TODAYS; DATE. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE CONSIDERED A WAIVER OF TRIAL BY JURY.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 3-5 DAYS; COURT ORDERS MATTER TO MEDIATION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES.; CASE REFERRED TO COURT SPONSORED MEDIATION; HEARINGS:; THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 02/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 05/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/29/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LUZ TORRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0817 $7.00; 170207-0817-MC Reference Number 026-0004884945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0815 $14.00; 170207-0815-MC Reference Number 026-0004884945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LUZ TORRES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0768 $435.00; 170207-0768-MC Reference Number 026-0004884945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.