This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 23:27:31 (UTC).

TORRES-V-BARNES GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 TORRES-V-BARNES GROUP was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Sachs, Michael A, Foster, Bryan and Tomberlin, John M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6092

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Sachs, Michael A

Foster, Bryan

Tomberlin, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELISSA TORRES

CHRISTOPHER TORRES

Defendants

B C STOCKING DISTRIBUTING, A CALIFORNIA

BARNES GROUP INC.,AS SUCCESSOR BY

CHEVRON CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

MIDWEST MOTOR SUPPLY CO., AN OHIO

UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, A

KERN OIL & REFINING CO., A CALIFORNIA

OATEY CO., AN OHIOCORPORATION

DAP PRODUCTS INC.,A DELAWARE CORPORATION

HUSQVARNA PROFESSIONAL PRODUCTS, INC.,

SAFETY-KLEEN SYSTEMS, INC., A WISCONSIN

P-T TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A FLORIDA

QUAKER STATE CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY

PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. A PENNSYLVANIA

LIGHTHOUSE FOR THEBLIND (LHB INDUSTRIES,

NCH CORPORATION, ADELAWARE CORPORATION

BARNES GROUP INC. AS SUCCESSORBY ACQUISITI

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC

PETRO SOURCE INVESTMENTS, INC.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

METZGER LAW GROUP

Attorney at Metzger Law Group

401 E Ocean Blvd Suite 800

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorneys

WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER

555 South Flower St Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SINUNU BRUNI LLP

Attorney at Sinunu Bruni LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104-3311

STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 W. 5Th St., 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3500

GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP

101 W Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

EVERETT DOREY LLP

Attorney at EVERETT DOREY LLP

18300 Von Karman Avenue Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92612

MANNING GROSS & MASSENBURG LLP

Attorney at Manning Gross & Massenburg LLP

400 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 1450

Irvine, CA 92618

GLYNN & FINLEY, LLP

One Walnut Creek Center 100 Pringle Ave, Ste 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

& SMITH, LEWIS BRISBO IS BISGAARD

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HURRELL CANTRALL LLP

Attorney at HURRELL CANTRALL LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

POOLE & SHAFFERY, LLP

400 South Hope Street Suite 720

Los Angeles, CA 90071

AGUIRRE ALLEN LAW APC

3170 Fourth Ave Ste 250

San Diego, CA 92103

Other Attorneys

GATES, GONTER, GUY, PROUDFOOT & MUENCH, LLP

Attorney at GATES, GONTER, GUY, PROUDFOOT & MUENCH, LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

REED SMITH, LLP

355 Grand Ave Suite 2900

Losa Angeles, CA 90071-3659

Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Trails Law Group, APC

Attorney at Trails Law Group, APC

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

Poole Shaffety & Koegle, LLP

Jones Day - San Diego

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED.

RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED.

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED.

RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED.

MOTION RE: FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/26/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER TORRES, MELISSA TORRES (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/26/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER TORRES, MELISSA TORRES (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/26/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER TORRES, MELISSA TORRES (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/26/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER TORRES, MELISSA TORRES (IMAGED)

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

07/01/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

06/28/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed

06/15/2021: Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

03/24/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/22/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Summons Issued on

03/19/2021: Summons Issued on

Cross-Complaint Filed

03/19/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

03/09/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

03/09/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Notice Filed

11/30/2020: Notice Filed

Order Re: Filed

11/12/2020: Order Re: Filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

10/22/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

321 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed; Comment: Naming DOE 2 to be B'Laster LLC on Complaint filed on 2/26/19 by Christopher Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued on; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
459 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY CHRISTOPHER TORRES, MELISSA TORRES FOR ADVANCE JURY FEES 190226-0811-CK JFN/ 150.00 PAYMT 190226-0811-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 32039

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CHRISTOPHER TORRES, MELISSA TORRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER TORRES, MELISSA TORRES FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY CHRISTOPHER TORRES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 190226-0806-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190226-0806-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 32038

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midwest Motor Supply Inc; DBA : Kimball Midwest is a litigant

Latest cases where BARNES GROUP INC. SUCCESSOR BY is a litigant

Latest cases where PETRO SOURCE INVESTMENTS INC. FKA PETRO SOURCE REFINING CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HUSQVARNA PROFESSIONAL PRODUCTS INC is a litigant