This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 09:13:15 (UTC).

TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR -V- KARI A RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KARI A RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1292

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR

Respondent

KARI A RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMAS V PRATT

8560 Vineyard Ave Suite 108

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 07/20/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 04/28/2017 OF TOMAS RODRIGUEZ JR FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 04/28/2017 OF TOMAS RODRIGUEZ JR ORDERED ENTERED 07/20/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 07/02/18 BY TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • CLERK'S OFFICE RETURNED JUDGMENT PACKET FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: AGREEMENT MUST BE NOTARIZED *.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • FINDING & ORDER AFTER HEARING; HEARING DATE: 01/11/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY KARI A RODRIGUEZ RE: CUSTODY/VISITATION TEMP ORDERS (122017); Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; GUY BOVEE, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS 7776; BAILIFF: K CANNON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY THOMAS PRATT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR PRESENT; RESPONDENT KARI A RODRIGUEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- KARI RODRIGUEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATY THOMAS PRATT .; WITNESS -- TOMAS RODRIGUEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; KARI A RODRIGUEZ'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: CUSTODY/VISITATION IS GRANTED; THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:; PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 3048, THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CUSTODY UNDER THE FAMILY CODE AND THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.; ALL PREVIOUS ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT WITH THE FOLLOWING MODIFICATIONS:; EXCHANGES SHALL BE ON MONDAY OF EACH WEEK, AFTER SCHOOL IF SCHOOL IN SESSION OR 12NOON IF NO; SCHOOL.; PARENTS SHALL SHARE HOLIDAYS AS MUTUALLY AGREED.; PETITIONER TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION FILED BY TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR RE:RFO FILED BY KARI A RODRIGUEZ ON 12/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • TEMPORARY EMERGENCY ORDER AS TO RFO FILED ON 122017 FILED BY KARI A RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY KARI A RODRIGUEZ RE: CUSTODY/VISITATION TEMP ORDERS (122017).

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 04/28/2017 OF TOMAS RODRIGUEZ JR AS TO KARI A RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR TOMAS A RODRIGUEZ JR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KARI A RODRIGUEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170428-0018 $435.00; 170428-0018-VS Reference Number 031-0013579083

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.