This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:43:02 (UTC).

TIFFANY SANDEFFER -V- JASON UMANA

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 TIFFANY SANDEFFER -V- JASON UMANA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3159

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIFFANY NICOLE SANDEFFER

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JASON UMANA

PROSCILLA D RODRIGUEZ

MAYRA UMANA

JULIO UMANA

PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF LARRY H. PARKER, INC.

350 San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

P.O. Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2018
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2017 OF PRISCILLA RODRIGUEZ FILED BY PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ, ON 01/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TIFFANY NICOLE SANDEFFER, PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 09:01; NO APPEARANCE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR SET FOR 02/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2017 OF PRISCILLA RODRIGUEZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DEFENDANT PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TIFFANY SANDEFFER BY PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ FOR 1ST APP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170830-0668 $435.00; 170830-0668-CK Reference Number 928010585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • ANSWER FILED BY PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/15/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PARTY PRISCILLA D RODRIGUEZ UPDATED: DEF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TIFFANY NICOLE SANDEFFER FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0484 $435.00; 170711-0484-CK Reference Number 327332

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less