This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 17:45:50 (UTC).

TIFFANY HAMILTON -N- CECIL FRANK HAMILTON

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 TIFFANY HAMILTON -N- CECIL FRANK HAMILTON was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6562

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TIFFANY HAMILTON

Respondent

CECIL FRANK HAMILTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/01/2017 OF TIFFANY HAMILTON FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/01/2017 OF TIFFANY HAMILTON ORDERED ENTERED 06/01/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANNOT TELL WHAT CHILD SUPPORT/SPOUSAL SUPPORT ORDERS PETITIONER IS REQUESTING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON CECIL FRANK HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLEASE PROVIDE AN ORIGINAL SIGNATURE FOR THE FL170.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON TIFFANY HAMILTON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY TIFFANY HAMILTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF TIFFANY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY TIFFANY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TIFFANY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S44

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.