This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 09:51:55 (UTC).

THOMAS V TARGET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 THOMAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0186

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALYSON THOMAS

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO TARGET CORPORATION. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO TARGET CORPORATION. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- ENTIRE ACTION/WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- ENTIRE ACTION/WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- ENTIRE ACTION/WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO TARGET CORPORATION. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PARTY TARGET CORPORATION UPDATED: DEFENDANT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALYSON THOMAS FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0256 $2.50; 170131-0256-MC Reference Number 026-0004376918

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ALYSON THOMAS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ALYSON THOMAS FOR 1ST PAPER FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ALYSON THOMAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.