This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:02:40 (UTC).

THOMAS GERARD MAZONE

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 THOMAS GERARD MAZONE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0897

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANGELINA MAZONE

Decedent

THOMAS GERARD MAZONE

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NETT & NETT, P.C.

27555 Ynez Road, Suite 205

Temecula, CA 92951

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT RE: BY TONI MAZONE FILED.

RECEIPT RE: BY TONI MAZONE FILED.

RECEIPT RE: NETT & NETT FILED.

RECEIPT RE: NETT & NETT FILED.

ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED

ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED

HRG OF 07/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SVCS FOR SYNCHRONY BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $313.60.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SVCS FOR SYNCHRONY BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $313.60.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

HRG OF 02/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY ANGELINA MAZONE.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY ANGELINA MAZONE.

NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY ANGELINA MAZONE.

NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY ANGELINA MAZONE.

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINSTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINSTRATION)

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $878.74.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $878.74.

HRG OF 11/17/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/17/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/17/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/17/16 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/07/2016 OF ANGELINA MAZONE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - ACCOUNTING REVIEW FILED 04/24/2017 OF ANGELINA MAZONE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: BY ANGELINA MAZONE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: BY TONI MAZONE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: NETT & NETT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ANGELINA MAZONE AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY AMY NETT MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT APPROVES STATUTORY FEES IN THE AMOUNT REQUESTED LESS THE $3900.00 ALREADY TAKEN BY; ADMINISTRATOR.; FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 07/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANGELINA MAZONE FOR FAXED WVR OF BOND; Minutes; Receipt: 160922-0174 $2.00; 160922-0174-VS Reference Number 023-0270320111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANGELINA MAZONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANGELINA MAZONE FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0231 $3.00; 160916-0231-VS Reference Number 023-0269763408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37PP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELINA MAZONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160907-0657 $465.00; 160907-0657-CK Reference Number 2529

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.