This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:09:27 (UTC).

THERESA AILEEN CORTEZ LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 THERESA AILEEN CORTEZ LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0911

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRENDA SIERDSMA

Other

THERESA AILE EN CORTEZ LI VING TRUST

Not Classified By Court

PAUL VANDEN PIERCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEINSTOCK MANION

1875 Century Park East Ste 200 0

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LAYNE A BARTHOLOMEW

222 N Mountain Ave Ste 100

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 01/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION:1)TO INVALIDATE TRUST;2)FOR RELIEF FRO M ELDER ABUSE;3)FOR RELIEF FROM CONVERSION ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION:1)TO INVALIDATE TRUST;2)FOR RELIEF FRO M ELDER ABUSE;3)FOR RELIEF FROM CONVERSION ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION:1)TO INVALIDATE TRUST;2)FOR RELIEF FRO M ELDER ABUSE;3)FOR RELIEF FROM CONVERSION ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION:1)TO INVALIDATE TRUST;2)FOR RELIEF FRO M ELDER ABUSE;3)FOR RELIEF FROM CONVERSION ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

PETITION RE: TO INVALIDATE TRUST FOR RELIEF FROM ELDER ABUSE FROM RELIEF FROM CONVERSION FILED.

PETITION RE: TO INVALIDATE TRUST FOR RELIEF FROM ELDER ABUSE FROM RELIEF FROM CONVERSION FILED.

PETITION RE: TO INVALIDATE TRUST FOR RELIEF FROM ELDER ABUSE FROM RELIEF FROM CONVERSION FILED.

PETITION RE: TO INVALIDATE TRUST FOR RELIEF FROM ELDER ABUSE FROM RELIEF FROM CONVERSION FILED.

HRG OF 01/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BRENDA SIERDSMA.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BRENDA SIERDSMA.

HRG OF 12/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF RULING AFTER MARCH 21,2017 HEARING FILED BY BRENDA SIERDSMA.

NOTICE OF RULING AFTER MARCH 21,2017 HEARING FILED BY BRENDA SIERDSMA.

HRG OF 03/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PETITION BY MAIL ON 11/30/16 AS TO WEINSTOCK MANION, A LAW CORP., FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PETITION BY MAIL ON 11/30/16 AS TO WEINSTOCK MANION, A LAW CORP., FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUED HEARING AFTER 11/01/16 FILED BY BRENDA SIERDSMA.

NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUED HEARING AFTER 11/01/16 FILED BY BRENDA SIERDSMA.

HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2018
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL (FIFTH DAY OF TRIAL- ALL DAY); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL (FOURTH DAY OF TRIAL); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL (THIRD DAY OF TRIAL); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL (SECOND DAY OF TRIAL); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL- FIRST DAY OF TRIAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2016
  • ON THE PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/12/2016 OF BRENDA SIERDSMA, PAUL VANDEN PIERCE IS ADDED AS A OBJECTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUED HEARING AFTER 11/01/16 FILED BY BRENDA SIERDSMA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PETITION FOR TO INVALIDATE TRUST FOR RELIEF FROM ELDER ABUSE FROM RELIEF FROM CONVERSION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LAWANA VASQUEZ 12582; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SAMUEL CROWE INDICATES HE IS NOT MAKING AN APPEARANCE; HE IS PRIOR COUNSEL OF THERESA; CORTEZ.; ATTORNEY JESSICA BABRICK PRESENT FOR BRENDA SIERDSMA.; ATTORNEY LAYNE BARTHOLOMEW PRESENT FOR PAUL PIERCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL- TO FILE OBJECTIONS.; OBJECTIONS ARE TO BE FILED BY DECEMBER 1, 2016.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/31/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/28/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON GRANTING PETITION TO INVALIDATE TRUST RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO INVALIDATE TRUST FOR RELIEF FROM ELDER ABUSE FROM RELIEF FROM CONVERSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160912-0625 $465.00; 160912-0625-CK Reference Number 122364

    Read MoreRead Less