This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:37:23 (UTC).

THE RENZO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/27/2016 THE RENZO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0966

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DESIRIE A GAULT

Other

THE RENZO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEBER, JOHN F

520 Barstow Road

Barstow, CA 92311

 

Court Documents

ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE AND CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUST FILED

ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE AND CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUST FILED

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DESIRIE A. GAULT FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DESIRIE A. GAULT FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY MARIAH BOIK FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY MARIAH BOIK FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DENISE M. BOIK FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DENISE M. BOIK FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DESTINIE L. RENZO FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DESTINIE L. RENZO FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY NICHOLAS RENZO FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY NICHOLAS RENZO FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY MORGAN BOIK FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY MORGAN BOIK FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY JASZMINE MAYHEW FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY JASZMINE MAYHEW FILED.

HRG OF 01/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

FIRST VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE AND ASSETS FILED.

FIRST VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE AND ASSETS FILED.

HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/10/16 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/10/16 W/POS FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE & CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUST FILED.

PETITION RE: ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE & CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUST FILED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DESIRIE A GAULT FOR CERT COPY OF ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS; Minutes; Receipt: 170126-0199 $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE AND CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DESIRIE A. GAULT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY MARIAH BOIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DENISE M. BOIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY DESTINIE L. RENZO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY NICHOLAS RENZO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY MORGAN BOIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY JASZMINE MAYHEW FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE & CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUST; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN F. WEBER PRESENT FOR DESIRIE A. GAULT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/27/2016 OF DESIRIE GAULT IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/27/2016 OF DESIRIE GAULT ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2016
  • PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE & CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUST; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN WEBER PRESENT FOR DESIRIE GAULT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR COUNSEL TO FILE A SUPPLEMENT TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/26/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/10/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/10/16 W/POS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON CONFIRMING TRUSTEE & CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUS RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: ORDER CONFIRMING TRUSTEE & CONFIRMING ASSETS OF THE TRUST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160927-0010 $465.00; 160927-0010-CK Reference Number 111

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.