This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:05:41 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE -V- SHALABI, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 THE PEOPLE filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SHALABI. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1679

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A

TAREK IBRAHIM MUSTAFA,

KAIED OTHMAN SHALABI.

FATIMA SHALABI

DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL

WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER

VICTOR VALLEY REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY, A

FARID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER

FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR, A

JOSE OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEPUTY ATTORNEY

100 South Main Street Ste 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3702

Defendant Attorneys

BARRETT, MICHAEL J

2244 Walnut Grove Ave 3Rd Flr

Rosemead, CA 91770

UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

300 N. Los Angeles Street Room 7211 Federal Building

Los Angeles, CA 90012

CENTURY LAW GROUP

5200 W Century Blvd Suite 940

Los Angeles, CA 90045

COUNTY COUNSEL - SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

385 N Arrowhead Avenue.. 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 12/20/17; JUDGMENT FOR: FARID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER; AND AGAINST THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $14,790.90 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $14,790.90; JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 12/20/17; JUDGMENT FOR: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KAIED OTHMAN SHALABI., FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF, WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER, JOSE OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER, TAREK IBRAHIM MUSTAFA,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTOR VALLEY REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY, A, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL, FATIMA SHALABI, COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; HAVING DISCLAIMED ANY AND ALL RIGHT, TITLE OR INTEREST IN PARCEL 23648-1, THESE DEFENDANTS ARE; NOT ENTITLED TO ANY COMPENSATION IN THIS PROCEEDING. THE COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION; OVER THE PARTIES TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT UNTIL PERFORMANCE IN FULL OF THE TERMS OF THE; SETTLEMENT, AS PROVIDED UNDER CCP 664.6 OR BY ANY PROCEDURE PERMITTED BY LAW IN THE SUPERIOR; COURT OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY.; ACTION - COMPLETE

DISCLAIMER FILED BY WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER.

DISCLAIMER FILED BY WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY FILED AS TO WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER. PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACK OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY FILED AS TO WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER. PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACK OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

DISCLAIMER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

DISCLAIMER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KAIED OTHMAN SHALABI. FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KAIED OTHMAN SHALABI. FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY BY FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 02/01/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY BY FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 02/01/17 FILED

DISCLAIMER FILED BY FATIMA SHALABI.

DISCLAIMER FILED BY FATIMA SHALABI.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY BY WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 02/01/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY BY WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 02/01/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY BY TAREK IBRAHIM MUSTAFA, WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 02/01/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY BY TAREK IBRAHIM MUSTAFA, WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 02/01/17 FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY FILED AS TO FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF. PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACK OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY FILED AS TO FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF. PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACK OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF FILED.

ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED

ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED; Minutes; SEE FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FOR SPECIFICS; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY FILED AS TO KAIED OTHMAN SHALABI.. PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACK OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NTC OF PENDENCY FILED AS TO KAIED OTHMAN SHALABI.. PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACK OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST AND ORDER FOR RELEASE OF DEPOSIT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED; Minutes; SEE FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FOR SPECIFICS; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $14,790.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 12/20/17; JUDGMENT FOR: FARID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER; AND AGAINST THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $14,790.90 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $14,790.90; JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 12/20/17; JUDGMENT FOR: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KAIED OTHMAN SHALABI., FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF, WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER, JOSE OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER, TAREK IBRAHIM MUSTAFA,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTOR VALLEY REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY, A, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL, FATIMA SHALABI, COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; HAVING DISCLAIMED ANY AND ALL RIGHT, TITLE OR INTEREST IN PARCEL 23648-1, THESE DEFENDANTS ARE; NOT ENTITLED TO ANY COMPENSATION IN THIS PROCEEDING. THE COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION; OVER THE PARTIES TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT UNTIL PERFORMANCE IN FULL OF THE TERMS OF THE; SETTLEMENT, AS PROVIDED UNDER CCP 664.6 OR BY ANY PROCEDURE PERMITTED BY LAW IN THE SUPERIOR; COURT OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY TUCKER WISDOM-STACK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL INDICATES THAT PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT AND A STIPULATED JUDGMENT IS TO BE; FILED.; COUNSEL LODGES A PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION TO BE PLACED IN THE FILE; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT SET FOR 04/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLAIMER BY KAIED OTHMAN SHALABI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLAIMER BY FADUA SHALABI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • PLAINTIFF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, VICTOR VALLEY REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY, A, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR, A, FATIMA SHALABI IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, FADUA SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER DECLARATION OF, WALID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER, FARID OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER, JOSE OTHMAN SHALABI, TRUSTEE UNDER, TAREK IBRAHIM MUSTAFA,, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.