This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:59:26 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE -V- MADAN AGGARWAL, LP, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 THE PEOPLE filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against MADAN AGGARWAL, LP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1606

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

MANDAN M. AGGARWAL

HORNBLOWER, AGGARWAL & RIALTO,LP A

SURYA GUPTA, AS TRUSTEE OF THENOORI MEHTA

MADAN AGGARWAL, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

GLF ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

BOYD A. DAVIS

SOUTHLAND TITLE CORPORATION, ACALIFORNIA

SURYA GUPTA

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

VICTOR VALLEY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT

LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY, ASUCCESSOR IN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEPUTY ATTORNEY

100 South Main Street Ste 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3702

Defendant Attorneys

LISA DELORME

2244 Walnut Grove

Rosemead, CA 91770

CENTURY LAW GROUP

5200 W Century Blvd Suite 940

Los Angeles, CA 90045

COUNTY COUNSEL - SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

385 N Arrowhead Avenue.. 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GURKIRPA INVESTMENT INC IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON/S: CASE; TITLE AND CASE NAME DO NOT CORRESPOND WITH COURT RECORDS. PARTY IS NOT LISTED AS A DEFENDANT TO; THE CASE LISTED ON DOCUMENT. UNABLE TO LOCATE CORRECT CASE NUMBER. PLEASE VERIFY, CORRECT AND; RESUBMIT DOCUMENT

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GURKIRPA INVESTMENT INC IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON/S: CASE; TITLE AND CASE NAME DO NOT CORRESPOND WITH COURT RECORDS. PARTY IS NOT LISTED AS A DEFENDANT TO; THE CASE LISTED ON DOCUMENT. UNABLE TO LOCATE CORRECT CASE NUMBER. PLEASE VERIFY, CORRECT AND; RESUBMIT DOCUMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HORNBLOWER, AGGARWAL & RIALTO,LP A SERVED ON 02/03/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HORNBLOWER, AGGARWAL & RIALTO,LP A SERVED ON 02/03/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.

JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 03/27/19; REFER TO JUDGMENT ON FILE FOR SPECIFICS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

STIPULATION RE: FOR ORDER FOR POSSESSION FILED.

STIPULATION RE: FOR ORDER FOR POSSESSION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 07/07/17; JUDGMENT FOR: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SURYA GUPTA, AS TRUSTEE OF THENOORI MEHTA SERVED ON 02/03/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SURYA GUPTA, AS TRUSTEE OF THENOORI MEHTA SERVED ON 02/03/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED

DISCLAIMER FILED BY GLF ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED.

DISCLAIMER FILED BY GLF ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY, ASUCCESSOR IN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY, ASUCCESSOR IN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 03/27/19; REFER TO JUDGMENT ON FILE FOR SPECIFICS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: FOR JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHELLE BIGLARIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: DISMISSAL.; COUNSEL REPRESENTS PROPERTY OWNER HAS NOT EXECUTED STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/23/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 10/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A, ADD SOUTHERN SIERRAS POWER COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A, SOUTHLAND TITLE CORPORATION, ACALIFORNIA, HORNBLOWER, AGGARWAL & RIALTO,LP A, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, MANDAN M. AGGARWAL, SURYA GUPTA, SURYA GUPTA, AS TRUSTEE OF THENOORI MEHTA, GLF ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED, BOYD A. DAVIS, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, A IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less