This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:15:56 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE-V-32,920.00 US CURRENCY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE-V-32,920 00 US CURRENCY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1428

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Claimant

JAMES VICTOR MCGILBERRY

Defendants

$32,920.00 US CURRENCY

$445.00 US CURRENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEPUTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W 3Rd Street 5Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Claimant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF AARON L. TURNER

357 W. 2Nd Street Suite 10

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JAMES VICTOR MCGILBERRY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF AARON L. TURNER.

ANSWER FILED BY JAMES VICTOR MCGILBERRY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF AARON L. TURNER.

FILED PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF A NOTICE OF SEIZURE AS TO $32,920.00 US CURRENCY, $445.00 US CURRENCY. PUBLICATION COMPLETED ON 01/26/18.

FILED PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF A NOTICE OF SEIZURE AS TO $32,920.00 US CURRENCY, $445.00 US CURRENCY. PUBLICATION COMPLETED ON 01/26/18.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA REBECA HYNDS PRESENT.; ATTORNEY AARON TURNER PRESENT FOR JAMES VICTOR MCGILBERRY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS HEARING ON PETITION.; COURT CONFERS WITH COUNSEL REGARDING STATUS. COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT THAT DISCOVERY IS; STILL PENDING AND THE CORRESPONDING CRIMINAL CASE IS STILL ONGOING.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/21/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF A NOTICE OF SEIZURE AS TO $32,920.00 US CURRENCY, $445.00 US CURRENCY. PUBLICATION COMPLETED ON 01/26/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JAMES VICTOR MCGILBERRY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF AARON L. TURNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, JAMES VICTOR MCGILBERRY IS ADDED AS A CLAIMANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less