This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:16:07 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE-V-$2,160.00 US CURRENCY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE-V- 2,160 00 US CURRENCY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1429

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

$8,725.63 US CURRENCY

$2,160.00 US CURRENCY

$15,010.00 US CURRENCY

Respondent

JUAN F VARGAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEPUTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W 3Rd Street 5Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

 

Court Documents

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION HEARING FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION HEARING FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION OF FORFEITURE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION OF FORFEITURE FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO FRANCISCO VARGAS FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO FRANCISCO VARGAS FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, JUAN F VARGAS IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • REQ FOR DEFAULT AS TO RESP JUAN F. VARGAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA REBECA HYNDS PRESENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: FRANCISCO VARGAS; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS HEARING ON PETITION.; COURT CONFERS WITH COUNSEL REGARDING STATUS OF PETITION.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/21/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO FRANCISCO VARGAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION OF FORFEITURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 12/29/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27 - RESCHEDULED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 12/29/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less