This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:05:33 (UTC).

THE MICHAEL MORALES II FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/09/2016 THE MICHAEL MORALES II FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0904

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MICHAEL DAVID MORALES

DANIEL PAUL MORALES

Other

THE MICHAEL MORALES II FAMILY TRUST

 

Court Documents

ORDER DETERMINING THE EXISTENCE OF A TRUST AND INSTRUCTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED

ORDER DETERMINING THE EXISTENCE OF A TRUST AND INSTRUCTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/20/16 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/20/16 W/POS FILED.

HRG OF 10/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE THE EXISTENCE OF AS TRUST & FOR INSTRUCTIONS FILED.

PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE THE EXISTENCE OF AS TRUST & FOR INSTRUCTIONS FILED.

PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE THE EXISTENCE OF AS TRUST & FOR INSTRUCTIONS FILED.

PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE THE EXISTENCE OF AS TRUST & FOR INSTRUCTIONS FILED.

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING THE EXISTENCE OF A TRUST AND INSTRUCTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170105-0117 $52.00; 170105-0117-VS Reference Number 031-0004555586

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO DETERMINE THE EXISTENCE OF AS TRUST & FOR INSTRUCTIONS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: GABRIELA MARTIN; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; DANIEL PAUL MORALES PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT REVIEWED THE ORDER AND WILL SIGN.; PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/09/2016 OF MICHAEL MORALES IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/09/2016 OF MICHAEL MORALES ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • PETITION FOR TO DETERMINE THE EXISTENCE OF AS TRUST & FOR INSTRUCTIONS; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: GABRIELA MARTIN; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; MICHAEL DAVID MORALES PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT ADVISES PETITIONER THE CASE IS STILL UNDER REVIEW BY LEGAL RESEARCH. MATTER WILL BE; CONTINUED TO ALL FOR COMPLETION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/05/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 10/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/20/16 W/POS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 10/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING THE EXISTENCE OF A TRUST RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE THE EXISTENCE OF AS TRUST & FOR INSTRUCTIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160909-0560 $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.