This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/14/2018 at 05:22:02 (UTC).

THE MATTER OF: APRIL BETH PITZER

Case Summary

On 07/13/2012 THE MATTER OF APRIL BETH PITZER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0001

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GLORIA MAE DENTON

Defendant

: APRIL BETH PITZER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CALDWELL, KENNEDY & PORTER, A.P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/27/2012

DocketCERT COPY OF ORDR ESTABLISHING MAILED TO ATTY OF RECORD ALONG WITH DELAYED REGISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2012

DocketORDER ESTABLISHING FACT OF DEATH FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2012

DocketSTATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN B GIBSON, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; COURT REPORTER LONI HUNLEY 11489; BAILIFF: T NANCARROW; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEANNE KENNEDY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS ON PETN ESTABLISHING FACT OF DEATH.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE BIRTH, DEATH, OR MARRIAGE DID IN FACT OCCUR AT THE TIME AND PLACE SHOWN BY THE PROOFS CITED IN THE PETITION.; PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF BIRTH, DEATH, MARRIA FILED 07/13/2012 OF GLORIA DENTON IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO ESTABLISH FACT OF BIRTH, DEATH, MARRIA FILED 07/13/2012 OF GLORIA DENTON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2012

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION BY MAIL ON 07/31/12 AS TO SEE ATTACHED MAILING LIST, FILED. (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

DocketSTATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JOHN B GIBSON, JUDGE; CLERK: BECKY GENOVESI; NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: T NANCARROW; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEANNIE KENNEDY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GLORIA MAE DENTON; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS HEARING ON PETITION.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; AT THE REQUEST OF THE PETITIONER;; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/27/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; BY REQUEST OF ATTORNEY KENNEDY, COURT WILL ACCEPT NON-APPEARANCE BY THE PLAINTIFF AND PROCEED BY; DECLARATION.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTORNEY KENNEDY.; ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2012

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2012

DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GLORIA MAE DENTON.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2012

DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2012

DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GLORIA MAE DENTON IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2012

DocketFILING FEE WAIVED ON GLORIA MAE DENTON FOR 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF $225.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2012

DocketDECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF PTN TO ESTABLISH RECORD OF DEATH FILED BY GLORIA MAE DENTON (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2012

DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2012

DocketPETITION FILED (CIVIL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less