This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:29:32 (UTC).

THE MARY C BENART SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 THE MARY C BENART SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0957

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHARLES SHORE

Other

THE MARY C BENART SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST

Not Classified By Court

RANDALL B BENART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JAMES L HEYWOOD AND ASSOCIATES

14467 Park Avenue

Victorville, CA 92392

Not Classified By Court Attorney

VARNER & BRANDT

3237 E Guasti Road Ste. 220

Ontario, CA 91761

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 04/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 041218 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 041218 FILED.

OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBU FILED BY TION OF ASSETS ETC

OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBU FILED BY TION OF ASSETS ETC

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/18/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/18/18 FILED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • HEARING RE: PTN TO DET PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON MISCELLANEOUS PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/27/2017 OF CHARLES SHORE HELD.(PROBATE); AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES HEYWOOD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY LESLIE RILEY PRESENT FOR RANDALL BENART.; RANDALL BENART PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MATTER SETTLED IN MEDIATION. SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PLACED ON THE RECORD.; MR. HEYWOOD TO PREPARE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SET FOR 11/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • HEARING RE: PTN TO DET PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBUTION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES HEYWOOD PRESENT FOR CHARLES SHORE.; ATTORNEY LESLIE RILEY PRESENT FOR RANDALL BENART.; RANDALL BENART PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); SETTLMENT AGREEMENT TO BE FILED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • HRG OF 08/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • HRG OF 08/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • HEARING RE: PET TO DET PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBUTION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES HEYWOOD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY NICOLE VARNER PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; PARTIES HAVE ENGAGED IN MEDIATION THIS MORNING AND REQUEST ANOTHER MEDIATION DATE TO CONDUCT; FURTHER DISCOVERY.; THE COURT ADVANCES AND CONTINUES 7/19/18 HEARING TO TRAIL MEDIATION.; HEARINGS:; VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S34P; HEARING RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION SET FOR 08/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; HEARING RE: PTN TO DET PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBUTION SET FOR 08/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • HEARING RE: PET TO DET PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBUTION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES L. HEYWOOD PRESENT FOR CHARLES SHORE.; ATTORNEY LESLIE RILEY PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT..; REASON: TO EFFECT PROPER SERVICE.; COUNSEL AMENABLE TO COURT SPONSORED MEDIATION.; HEARINGS:; THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 06/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2018
  • ON THE MISCELLANEOUS PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/27/2017 OF CHARLES SHORE, RANDALL B BENART IS ADDED AS A OBJECTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • HEARING RE: PET TO DET PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBUTION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES HEYWOOD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY LESLIE RILEY PRESENT FOR RANDALL AND DANIEL BENART.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: NOTICE TO BE GIVEN; OBJECTIONS TO BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/12/18 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/18/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHARLES SHORE FOR PETITION AND COURT REPORTER; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0209 $465.00; 170927-0209-DB Reference Number 031-0046531257

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less