This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/28/2018 at 16:44:17 (UTC).

THE MAHR GROUP-V-VINEYARD BANK

Case Summary

On 01/11/2010 THE MAHR GROUP-V-VINEYARD BANK was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0210

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE MAHR GROUP, LLC

Defendants

VINEYARD BANK

CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PHILLIP G TRAD

2603 Main Street Suite 1150

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorney

RUTAN & TUCKER

611 Anton Blvd, Ste 1440

Costa Mesa, CA 32921

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2011
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:SANCTIONS FTA PHILLIP TRAD 111010; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: CASE DISMISSED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • FILE SENT TO S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; HEATHER HERD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT THE PARTIES ARE ATTEMPTING TO WORK OUT A LOAN PROPOSAL. THIS; CASE MAY BE RESOLVED. DEFENDANTS COUNSEL DOES NOT KNOW WHY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL HAS NOT MADE AN; APPEARANCE THIS MORNING.; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER AND SETS AN OSC; RE: SANCTION HEARING.; PHILLIP TRAD IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND/OR FAILURE TO FILE REQUIRED DOCUMENTS.; HEARINGS:; FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32; HEARING RE: OSC RE:SANCTIONS FTA PHILLIP TRAD 111010 SET FOR 01/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER WITH NEW HEARING DATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • FILE SENT TO S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE MAHR GROUP, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PHILLIP TRAD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY HANNI PICHEL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THE THE DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST HAS RECENTLY; ANSWERED. THE COURT MAY DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE DEFENDANT VINEYARD BANK.; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT VINEYARD BANK WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; HEARINGS:; FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/10/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/12/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING.; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PHILLIP TRAD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT THE WRONG AGENT FOR SERVICE WAS SERVED ON THE; DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST. HE BELIEVES THE PROPER AGENT HAS BEEN SERVED AND WILL FILE; THE PROOF OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT. HE INTENDS TO DISMISS VINEYARD BANK WHEN HE FILES THE PROOF; OF SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/14/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING.; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PHILLIP TRAD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON THE COURTS MOTION THIS HEARING IS CONTINUED AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/14/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE MAHR GROUP, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING.; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF VIA TELECOM.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INFORMS THE CLERK THAT HE INTENDS TO DISMISS VINEYARD BANK, CALIFRONIA; BANK AND TRUST HAVE BEEN SERVED THE PROOF OF SERVICE WILL BE FILED WITH THE COURT NEXT WEEK.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/16/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • CASE TRACKED TO S32 FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100111-1033 $355.00; 100111-1033-CK Reference Number 6343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAHR GROUP LLC THE is a litigant

Latest cases where Vineyard Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. DBA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST FKA ZB N.A. is a litigant