This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:09:52 (UTC).

THE LOOMIS FAMILY EXEMPT MARITAL TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/13/2016 THE LOOMIS FAMILY EXEMPT MARITAL TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0912

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

O CHARLES LOOMIS II

Other

THE LOOMIS FAMILY EXEMPT MARITAL TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHUMATE, CHRISTOPHER A

1801 Orange Tree Lane Suite 230

Redlands, CA 92374

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 03/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PETITION TO COMPEL FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PETITION TO COMPEL FILED.

MINUTE ORDER OF 02/27/17 MAILING COVERSHEET (IMAGED)

MINUTE ORDER OF 02/27/17 MAILING COVERSHEET (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: SETTLMENT AGREEMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: SETTLMENT AGREEMENT FILED.

HRG OF 01/31/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/31/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/31/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/31/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 013117 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 013117 FILED.

HRG OF 11/08/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/08/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/08/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/08/16 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY MAIL ON 09/29/16 AS TO CHARLES J HUNT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY MAIL ON 09/29/16 AS TO CHARLES J HUNT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY MAIL ON 09/29/16 AS TO KATHLEEN HUNT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY MAIL ON 09/29/16 AS TO KATHLEEN HUNT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY MAIL ON 09/29/16 AS TO CHARLES J HUNT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY MAIL ON 09/29/16 AS TO CHARLES J HUNT, FILED.

AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL PRIOR TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT PETITION TO SURCHARGE ETC FILED.

AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL PRIOR TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT PETITION TO SURCHARGE ETC FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/08/16 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/08/16 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: TO COMPEL PRIOR TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT PETITION TO SURCHARGE PRIOR TRUSTEE FOR BREACHES OF TRUST FILED.

PETITION RE: TO COMPEL PRIOR TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT PETITION TO SURCHARGE PRIOR TRUSTEE FOR BREACHES OF TRUST FILED.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO COMPEL PRIOR TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT PETITION TO SURCHARGE PRIOR TRUSTEE FOR BREACHES OF TRUST; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE BY COURT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PETITION TO COMPEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER OF 02/27/17 MAILING COVERSHEET (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • COURT SIGNS STIPULATION/ORDER ON 2/27/17; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; MATTER NOT ON CALENDAR- NOT REPORTED; NO PARTIES ARE PRESENT. COURT SIGNS STIPULATION AND ORDER; WHEREIN THE PETITION IS BEING DISMISSED AND THE HEARING DATE ON THE PETITION IS BEING VACATED.; SEE STIPLUATION AND ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT ON FEBRUARY 27, 2017.; PETITION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; HEARINGS:; VACATE PETPR HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 02/27/17 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 032317 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/13/2016 OF O LOOMIS II - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/13/2016 OF O LOOMIS II - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/13/2016 OF O LOOMIS II - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION BY MAIL ON 09/15/16 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL PRIOR TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT PETITION TO SURCHARGE ETC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/08/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FOR PETITION TO COMPEL PRIOR TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO COMPEL PRIOR TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT PETITION TO SURCHARGE PRIOR TRUSTEE FOR BREACHES OF TRUST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160913-0601 $465.00; 160913-0601-CK Reference Number 12808

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.