This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:33:06 (UTC).

THE JOHN AND MARGARET GARDNER LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 THE JOHN AND MARGARET GARDNER LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0955

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHARLES HAIMAN

Other

THE JOHN AND MARGARET GARDNER LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PACIFIC WEALTH LEGAL ADVISORS,APC

130 S Chaparral Court Suite 250

Anaheim, CA 92808

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED BY CHARLES HAIMAN.

NOTICE OF ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED BY CHARLES HAIMAN.

ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED

ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/17 AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/17 AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING ETC BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 11/10/17 AS TO DON DANIERI, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING ETC BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 11/10/17 AS TO DON DANIERI, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING BY OTHER ON 11/29/17 AS TO ADAM JEFFERY PHILLIPS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING BY OTHER ON 11/29/17 AS TO ADAM JEFFERY PHILLIPS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION AND NOTICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/10/17 AS TO TIMOTHY MICHAEL TOWERS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION AND NOTICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/10/17 AS TO TIMOTHY MICHAEL TOWERS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION AND NOTICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/13/17 AS TO JOHN MICHAEL PHILLIPS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION AND NOTICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/13/17 AS TO JOHN MICHAEL PHILLIPS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/29/17 AS TO KATHERINE MARIE PHILLIPS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/29/17 AS TO KATHERINE MARIE PHILLIPS, FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/17 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/26/2017 OF CHARLES HAIMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/26/2017 OF CHARLES HAIMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

PETITION RE: ORDER CONFIRMING VALIDITY OF TRUST FILED.

PETITION RE: ORDER CONFIRMING VALIDITY OF TRUST FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED BY CHARLES HAIMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHARLES HAIMAN FOR 3 CC COPIES OF ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 171219-0118 $52.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING VALIDITY OF TRUST; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEFFREY OGOREK PRESENT FOR CHARLES HAIMAN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/26/2017 OF CHARLES HAIMAN IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/26/2017 OF CHARLES HAIMAN ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/17 AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING ETC BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 11/10/17 AS TO DON DANIERI, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING BY OTHER ON 11/29/17 AS TO ADAM JEFFERY PHILLIPS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION AND NOTICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/10/17 AS TO TIMOTHY MICHAEL TOWERS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PETITION AND NOTICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/13/17 AS TO JOHN MICHAEL PHILLIPS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/29/17 AS TO KATHERINE MARIE PHILLIPS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/26/2017 OF CHARLES HAIMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: ORDER CONFIRMING VALIDITY OF TRUST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170926-0873 $465.00; 170926-0873-CK Reference Number D3576721

    Read MoreRead Less