This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:57:39 (UTC).

THE JOE B MELTON & MONICA T MELTON TRUST

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 THE JOE B MELTON MONICA T MELTON TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1091

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSEPH B MELTON

Other

THE JOE B MELTON &MONICA T MELTON TRUST

Not Classified By Court

CORA A BENIQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARLONI, DIANA J

14390 Civic Drive, Suite B

Victorville, CA 92392

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FLANIGAN, PHILIP M

4082 N Cedar Avenue Suite 104

Fresno, CA 93276

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 06/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/05/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/05/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/05/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/05/17 FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST IN TRUST FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST IN TRUST FILED.

HRG OF 08/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER RELIEVING ROSE C ROSADO AS COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY FILED

ORDER RELIEVING ROSE C ROSADO AS COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY FILED

NOTICE OF MEDIATION HEARING FILED BY JOSEPH B MELTON.

NOTICE OF MEDIATION HEARING FILED BY JOSEPH B MELTON.

HRG OF 05/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PETITIONERS REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO PETITION TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE ETC FILED.

PETITIONERS REPLY TO OBJECTIONS TO PETITION TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE ETC FILED.

OBJECTION TO PETITION TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE TO INFORMATION ETC FILED BY CORA A BENIQUEZ

OBJECTION TO PETITION TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE TO INFORMATION ETC FILED BY CORA A BENIQUEZ

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY JOSEPH B MELTON.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY JOSEPH B MELTON.

PETITION RE: TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE TO REPORT INFORMATION ABOUT THE TRUST TO THE BENEFICIARIES FILED.

PETITION RE: TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE TO REPORT INFORMATION ABOUT THE TRUST TO THE BENEFICIARIES FILED.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $740.00 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • CLAIM RECEIVED VERIFIED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT S35 FOR SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $740.00 RECEIVED FROM ROSE ROSADO FOR 03/16/17 TO 05/31/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST IN TRUST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE TO REPORT INFORMATION ABOUT THE TRUST TO THE BENEFICIARIES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACY MORRIS; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DIANA J. CARLONI PRESENT FOR JOSEPH B. MELTON.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY DIANA J. CARLONI FOR PHILIP M. FLANIGAN FOR CORA A BENIQUEZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PURSUANT TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT COURT DISMISSES THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREDJUDICE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACY MORRIS; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DIANA J. CARLONI PRESENT FOR JOSEPH B. MELTON.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY DIANA J. CARLONI FOR PHILIP M. FLANIGAN FOR CORA A. BENIQUZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: SETTLEMENT REACHED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE COMPLETION OF SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACY MORRIS; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DIANA J. CARLONI PRESENT FOR JOSEPH B. MELTON.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY DIANA J. CARLONI FOR PHILIP M. FLANIGAN FOR CORA A. BENIQUEZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: SETTLEMENT REACHED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RELIEVING ROSE C ROSADO AS COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2017
  • ON THE PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 11/01/2016 OF JOSEPH MELTON, CORA A BENIQUEZ IS ADDED AS A OBJECTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY JOSEPH B MELTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE TO REPORT BY MAIL ON 12/01/16 AS TO CORA A BENIQUEZ C/O PHILLIP M FLANIGAN, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/05/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • CITATION ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO COMPEL THE TRUSTEE TO REPORT INFORMATION ABOUT THE TRUST TO THE BENEFICIARIES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161101-0005 $465.00; 161101-0005-CK Reference Number 1951

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.