Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 19:53:23 (UTC).

THE INLAND OVERSIGHT -V- CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 THE INLAND OVERSIGHT filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9296

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Appellants

THE INLAND OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE

CREED-21

HIGHLAND HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Respondents and Interested Parties

CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorney

BRIGGS LAW CORPORATION

99 East C Street Suite 111

Upland, CA 91786

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

TILDEN, GRESHAM SAVA GE NOLAN AND

550 E Hospitality Lane Suite 300

San Bernardino, CA 92408

SAN BERNARDINO CITY ATTORNEY'SOFFICE

300 N. D Street

San Bernardino, CA 92418

, DONOVAN C CO LLIER

550 East Hospitality Ln Suite 300

San Bernardino, CA 92408

GRESHAM SAVAGE NOLAN & TILDEN

550 East Hospitality Lane Ste 300

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

ORDER, RUILING IS RESERVED PLACED IN FILE

ORDER, RUILING IS RESERVED PLACED IN FILE

NOTICE TO COURT REPORTER(S) TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT FILED.

NOTICE TO COURT REPORTER(S) TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT FILED.

NOTICE TO COURT REPORTER(S) FOR ESTIMATES OF APPEAL TRANSCRIPTS FILED.

NOTICE TO COURT REPORTER(S) FOR ESTIMATES OF APPEAL TRANSCRIPTS FILED.

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY THE INLAND OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE, CREED-21, HIGHLAND HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION.

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY THE INLAND OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE, CREED-21, HIGHLAND HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/ORDER BY PERSONAL ON 10/06/15 AS TO ALL PARTIES OF INTEREST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/ORDER BY PERSONAL ON 10/06/15 AS TO ALL PARTIES OF INTEREST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/23/15 AS TO MADELINE GOUGEON, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/23/15 AS TO MADELINE GOUGEON, FILED.

ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FILED

ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/21/15 AS TO KERI TAYLOR, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/21/15 AS TO KERI TAYLOR, FILED.

ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE (DENIED) FILED

ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE (DENIED) FILED

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY.

DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY; REPRESENTED BY GRESHAM SAVA GE NOLAN AND TILDEN(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY; REPRESENTED BY GRESHAM SAVA GE NOLAN AND TILDEN(IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COPY OF PLEADING, PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE BY MAIL ON 07/09/15 AS TO KAMALA D HARRIS, ATTY GENERAL, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COPY OF PLEADING, PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE BY MAIL ON 07/09/15 AS TO KAMALA D HARRIS, ATTY GENERAL, FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/08/15 WITH COSTS OF $81.90 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/08/15 WITH COSTS OF $81.90 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2016
  • ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER, RUILING IS RESERVED PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • RESPONDENTS JOINT OPPO BRIEF * PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • SUPPL REQ FOR JUDICIAL NTC IN SUPP OF RES RPLY BRIEF IN SUPP OF MTN TO DISMISS PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • OPPSTN TO APLANTS MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF RES MTN TO DISMS THE APPEAL OF CREED-21 PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • SUPPL DECL OF MARTIN STRATTE IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO DISMISS & REQ FOR JN PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • RES RPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO DISMISS THE APPEAL OF CREED-21 & THE INLAND PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • VOL 2 DECL OF MARTIN P STRATTE IN SUP MTN FROM 4TH APPELLATE DISTRICT COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • VOL 1 DECL OF MARTIN P STRATTE IN SUP OF MTN FROM 4TH APPELLATE DISTRICT COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PRO ORD ON REQ FOR JUDICIAL NTC FROM 4TH APPELLATE DISTRICT COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF COPY OF PLEADING, PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE BY MAIL ON 07/09/15 AS TO KAMALA D HARRIS, ATTY GENERAL, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/01/2015 OF THE INLAND OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTY IN INTEREST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/08/15 WITH COSTS OF $81.90 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE INLAND OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE FOR HRG RE: WRIT OF MANDATE; Minutes; Receipt: 150701-3056 $60.00; 150701-3056-CK Reference Number 66583

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE INLAND OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150701-3054 $435.00; 150701-3054-CK Reference Number 66583

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant