This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 04:23:09 (UTC).

THE HITCHING POST VS MAHLSTEDT

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 THE HITCHING POST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MAHLSTEDT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4272

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HITCHING POST,LLC

Defendants

ANDREA MAHLSTEDT

NAOMI MAHLSTEDT

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIHELICH, MICHAEL W

Po Box 2857

Riverside, CA 92516

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE HITCHING POST,LLC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE HITCHING POST,LLC.

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MIHELICH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT PRESENT; LYNN BENSON PRESENT ON BEHALF OF ANDREA MAHSTEDT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:36; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: THE HITCHING POST,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,949.77 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $3,374.28.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,134.05; PRINCIPAL AMOUNT OF $1949.77 CONSISTS OF $412.33 FOR PAST DUE RENT AND $1537.44 FOR UNPAID; UTILITIES; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 09/16/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 09:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Continued

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MIHELICH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; THE HITCHING POST,LLC REPRESENTED BY TINA MOSS.; DEFENDANT ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT PRESENT; LYNN BENSON (FOR ANDREA MAHLSTEDT) PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:58; LYNN BENSON SUBMITS POWER OF ATTORNEY TO COURT.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF OBJECTS TO POWER OF ATTORNEY; AFTER REVIEW OF POWER OF ATTORNEY, COURT DECLINES DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR LYNN BENSON TO ACT AS HER; POWER OF ATTORNEY. POWER OF ATTORNEY IS FOR HEALTH CARE ONLY.; DUE TO MEDICAL ISSUE COURT TAKE A BREAK FORM CASE.; 09:33; LYNN BENSON PRESENT AND APPEARING FOR ANDREA MAHLSTEDT. NO OBJECTION FROM PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/07/17 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; NOTICE WAIVED.; 09:34; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANDREA MAHLSTEDT; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/21/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANDREA MAHLSTEDT; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/21/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/21/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/21/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170621-0328 $255.00

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170814-0615 $25.00; 170814-0615-CK Reference Number 27333

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE HITCHING POST,LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MIHELICH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT PRESENT; LYNN BENSON PRESENT ON BEHALF OF ANDREA MAHSTEDT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:36; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: THE HITCHING POST,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,949.77 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $3,374.28.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,134.05; PRINCIPAL AMOUNT OF $1949.77 CONSISTS OF $412.33 FOR PAST DUE RENT AND $1537.44 FOR UNPAID; UTILITIES; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 09/16/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 09:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MIHELICH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; THE HITCHING POST,LLC REPRESENTED BY TINA MOSS.; DEFENDANT ANDREA MAHLSTEDT, NAOMI MAHLSTEDT PRESENT; LYNN BENSON (FOR ANDREA MAHLSTEDT) PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:58; LYNN BENSON SUBMITS POWER OF ATTORNEY TO COURT.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF OBJECTS TO POWER OF ATTORNEY; AFTER REVIEW OF POWER OF ATTORNEY, COURT DECLINES DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR LYNN BENSON TO ACT AS HER; POWER OF ATTORNEY. POWER OF ATTORNEY IS FOR HEALTH CARE ONLY.; DUE TO MEDICAL ISSUE COURT TAKE A BREAK FORM CASE.; 09:33; LYNN BENSON PRESENT AND APPEARING FOR ANDREA MAHLSTEDT. NO OBJECTION FROM PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/07/17 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; NOTICE WAIVED.; 09:34; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • RSF/DEFAULT/PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NAOMI MAHLSTEDT IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON NAOMI MAHLSTEDT FOR FIRST PAPER FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NAOMI MAHLSTEDT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY NAOMI MAHLSTEDT ON 07/03/17 ADDING PARTY AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $412.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $12.36.--BEGINNING ON 11/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170621-0328 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.